David Hill v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: David Hill
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2012cv01420
Filed: August 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Social Security Appeal, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/9/14. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Discharging Court's Order to Show Cause 22 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/13/13. (Verduzco, M)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER to show cause why plaintiff's social security appeal should not be deemed unopposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/12/2013. (Hernandez, M)
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER on stipulation for extension. Defendant's opposition to plaintiff's opening brief shall be served and filed on or before 12/6/2013. Plaintiff's reply shall be served and filed within 15 days of service of the opposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/6/2013. (Hernandez, M)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DISCHARGING Court's Order to Show Cause, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/2/2013. (7 - Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/24/2013. Show Cause Response due by 10/1/2013.(Lundstrom, T)
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER on stipulation extending plaintiff's time to file summary judgment motion. Plaintiff's time to file her summary judgment motion is hereby extended from 8/26/2013 to 9/20/2013. Defendant's opposition brief shall be filed within 30 days of the filing of plaintiff's opening brief. Defendant shall have 15 days from the date of service of defendant's opposition to file a reply brief. (Hernandez, M)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting extension of time and modifying scheduling order. The Commissioners confidential letter brief shall be served on or before July 10, 2013; Any stipulation to remand the case shall be filed on or before July 25, 2013; Plaintiffs opening brief shall be filed on or before August 26, 2013;Commissioners responsive brief shall be filed on or before September 25, 2013; and plaintiff may file a reply brief on or before October 2, 2013. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 6/20/2013. (Hernandez, M)
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/31/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David Hill v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hill
Represented By: Bess M. Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?