Valencia v. Gibson et al
Plaintiff: Abel Valencia
Defendant: Connie Gibson, D.J. Ruiz, R.C. Garcia and A. Mayo
Case Number: 1:2012cv01446
Filed: September 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Gerald B. Cohn
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 108 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Defendants' 85 86 Motion for Summary Judgment be Granted signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/26/2016. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 6/30/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 94 Motion for Continuance to Conduct Discovery Pursuant to Rule 56(D) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/4/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
December 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER GRANTING 88 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Service Documents signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/30/2015. Service documents due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Adopting Findings and Recommendations 78 , Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint 71 , Reinstating Plaintiff's Official Capacity Claim Against Defendant Jeffrey Beard and Striking First Amended Complaint from Record, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/3/15. (Verduzco, M)
September 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/22/15, referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER ADOPTING 65 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' 46 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 09/10/2015. (Flores, E)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER VACATING and RE-SCHEDULING the Dispositive Motion Deadline Set Forth In the September 16, 2014, Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/27/15. (Marrujo, C)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' 46 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 05/07/2015. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 6/10/2015.(Flores, E)
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DENYING, Without Prejudice, Plaintiff's Third 63 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/6/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 60 Motion for Appointment of Counsel and Request for Deposition by Written Questions signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/14/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Striking Plaintiff's 44 Response to Defendants' Answer signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/14/2014. (Flores, E)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying 39 Request for Entry of Default filed by Abel Valencia signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/29/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Denying as Moot Plaintiff's 25 Motion for Clarification signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 07/30/2014. (Flores, E)
April 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ADOPTING 19 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION, Dismissing Certain Claims and Defendants from the Action for Failure to State a Cognizable Claim, and Referring Matter Back to Magistrate Judge for Further Proceedings, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/18/14. (Verduzco, M)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's 20 Request for Court Order for Prison Officials to Forward Legal Material signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 04/02/2014. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 4/21/2014. (Flores, E)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATION Recommending Dismissal Of Certain Claims And Defendants From Action (ECF No. 18 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/21/2014. F&R's referred to Judge Stanley A. Boone; Objections to F&R due by 3/31/2014. (Fahrney, E)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Seal Mail 6 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 2/21/13. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valencia v. Gibson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abel Valencia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.J. Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.C. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?