Maya v. Leprino Foods Company
Plaintiff: Jesus Maya
Defendant: Leprino Foods Company
Case Number: 1:2012cv01479
Filed: September 7, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER for Dismissal of Action with Prejudice, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/12/14. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Re: Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 15 ), signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/17/2014. Defendant's motion is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The parties directed to contact the courtroom clerk of Magistrate Judge Gary Austin within twenty-one (21) days to set up a scheduling conference.. (Fahrney, E)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order VACATING Pretrial Conference set for November 21, 2013 and Trial Date set for January 7, 2014, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/4/2013. (Figueroa, O)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER vacating hearing date of October 7, 2013 and taking matter under submission. signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/3/13. (Nazaroff, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maya v. Leprino Foods Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Maya
Represented By: Shelley G. Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leprino Foods Company
Represented By: Sandra Lynn Rappaport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?