Schuster v. Johnson
Plaintiff: Larissa Schuster
Defendant: Deborah K. Johnson
Case Number: 1:2012cv01482
Filed: September 11, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER ADOPTING 156 Findings and Recommendation, DENYING Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, DIRECTING Clerk of Court to CLOSE CASE, and DECLINING TO ISSUE CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/10/2020. CASE CLOSED.(Sant Agata, S)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER GRANTING Unopposed Request to Extend Deadline for Filing of Objections signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/21/2020. (Sant Agata, S)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Denial of 4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/20/2019. Objections to F&R due within THIRTY (30) DAYS. (Orozco, A)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER directing Respondent to Lodge copy of the entire video footage of pretrial interview obtained from Fresno County Superior Court signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/15/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER Directing Respondent to File Further Status Report Within Fourteen (14) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/18/2019. (Jessen, A)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER Vacating July 11, 2019 Hearing, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/10/19. (Gonzalez, R)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER Directing Respondent to File Response Addressing Failure to Lodge Complete Recording of Petitioner's Pretrial Interview; ORDER Scheduling Hearing on 7/11/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/8/19. (Gonzalez, R)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER Directing Respondent to Lodge Complete Recording of Interview in Acceptable Media Format Within Seven (7) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/17/2019. (Jessen, A)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER DIRECTING Respondent to Lodge Recording of Interview in Acceptable Media Format signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/7/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER Directing Respondent to Lodge Recording of Interview Within Fourteen (14) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/14/2019. (Jessen, A)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER to electronically file transcripts and other necessary documents signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/1/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER RE Petitioner's 125 Notice of Intent to Rely on Petition on File signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/26/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting Petitioner's 121 Request for modification of briefing schedule signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/6/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER VACATING Continued Evidentiary Hearing; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Terminate Petitioner's Request for OSC Re: Contempt 105 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 04/30/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER denying without prejudice application for writ of habeas corpus ad prosequendum 108 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/3/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/2/2018. Evidentiary Hearing set for 4/11/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Witness and Exhibit Lists due by 4/6/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER for second hearing re: Civil Contempt signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/28/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER GRANTING 102 Petitioner's Fourth Request for Modification of Briefing Schedule signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/13/2018. Amended Petition or Notice of Intent due by 5/14/2018. (Jessen, A)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER DENYING 95 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/6/2018. (Kusamura, W)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER GRANTING 97 Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration by the District Court of Magistrate Judge's Ruling signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/28/2017. Opposition due by 1/11/2018. (Jessen, A)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER Granting Petitioner's 96 Request for Modification of Briefing Schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/22/17. Deadline: 3/13/2018. (Gonzalez, R)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting 85 Motion for Order directing Respondent to process Attorney Authorization Form signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/7/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER GRANTING Petitioner's 87 Unopposed Second Request for Modification of Briefing Schedule; Petitioner is granted to and including January 12, 2018 to file an amended petition for writ of habeas corpus or a notice of intent to rely on the petition currently filed, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/15/2017. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/13/2017 continuing hearing on Motion for order directing respondent to process the attorney authorization form 85 . Hearing continued to 12/6/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Lundstrom, T)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER GRANTING 83 Petitioner's Unopposed Request for Modification of Briefing Schedule signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/26/2017. Amended Petition or Notice due by 11/30/2017. (Jessen, A)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 CJA 20 ORDER, adding Katherine L. Hart as Attorney for Larissa Schuster, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 07/21/2017. (Martin-Gill, S)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 CJA 20 Appointment of and Authority to Pay Court Appointed Counsel; Katherine L. Hart appointed for Larissa Schuster, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 07/21/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER APPROVING Withdrawal of Attorney and ORDER APPOINTING the Federal Defender as Attorney of Record signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/10/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER FOLLOWING REMAND FROM THE NINTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/22/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING Petitioner's Request for Waiver of Fees on Appeal; ORDER GRANTING Petitioner's Request for Certificate of Appealability signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/5/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION Regarding Application of McQuiggin v. Perkins; AMENDED FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION Regarding Equitable Tolling, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/16/16. Referred to Judge Ishii; 30-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 CJA 20 ORDER Appointing Katherine Hart as Attorney for Larissa Schuster, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 07/8/15. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING 40 Petitioner's Counsel's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel; ORDER GRANTING Petitioner's Motion to Appoint Counsel; and ORDER GRANTING Petitioner's Request to Brief Luna v. Kernan signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/26/2015. cc: Federal Defender's Office. (Jessen, A)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Regarding Respondent's Failure to Respond to Court's May 18, 2015 Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/4/2015. (Jessen, A)
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER VACATING June 15, 2015 Hearing Date signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/3/2015. (Jessen, A)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/15/2015 continuing the hearing on 40 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel to 06/15/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Lundstrom, T)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER setting Briefing Schedule signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/23/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER ADOPTING 30 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN PART and REFERRING MATTER Back to the Magistrate Judge for Further Proceedings signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/18/2015. (Jessen, A)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 15 Respondent's Motion to Dismiss the Petition be GRANTED re 4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 5/17/2013. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER VACATING Hearing Date Set for Motion to Dismiss signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/17/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schuster v. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larissa Schuster
Represented By: Roger Taylor Nuttall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah K. Johnson
Represented By: Janet Ellen Neeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?