J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Aranda
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Ruben Garcia Aranda
Case Number: 1:2012cv01508
Filed: September 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:553
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions (Doc. 4). Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due within fifteen (15) days of service of this recommendation, any party may file written objections to these findings and recommendations with the Court and serve a copy on all parties. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/27/2015. (Herman, H)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Taking Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment (Doc. 47) Under Submission. the Court VACATES the hearing currently set for January 23, 2015, and ORDERS the parties NOT TO APPEAR at that time. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/13/2015. (Herman, H)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Adopting Findings and Recommendations 44 and Directing Clerk to Enter Default Against Defendant Ruben Garcia Aranda, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/19/14. (Verduzco, M)
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions (Doc. 40): (1) Plaintiff's motion for terminating sanctions against Defendant Ruben Garcia Aranda d/b/a El Cachanilla Pool House be GRANTED; (2) No answer has been filed by Defendant and therefore no answer can be stricken; (3) Default Entered against Defendant Ruben Garcia Aranda d/b/a El Cachanilla Pool House; (4) Any Motion for Default Judgment by Plaintiff be filed within 30 days from the date of adoption of the se Findings and Recommendations by the District Judge; (5) All other dates are VACATED. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due within 14 days of service of this recommendation. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/10/2014. (Herman, H)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Continuing Motion Hearing: Plaintiff's Motion for Terminating Sanctions (Doc. 40) - HEARING is RESET: Motion Hearing is continued from 8/22/2014 to October 10, 2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/1/2014. (Herman, H)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DISCHARGING Order to Show Cause to Ruben Garcia Aranda 34 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/1/2014. (Herman, H)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER for Plaintiff's Counsel to Submit Declaration: by 3/21/2014. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/13/2014. (Herman, H)
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Continuing Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference is set for 3/12/2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. If the parties are unable to settle, Defendant Ruben Garcia Aranda is admonished that he MUST APPEAR IN PERSON at the Scheduling Conference bring his own translator. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/21/2014. (Herman, H)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER After Settlement: ( 26 Notice of Settlement} - Court ORDERS the parties, no later than 12/18/2013, to file appropriate papers to dismiss or conclude this action in its entirety. Court VACATES all pending dates and matters. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/27/2013. (Herman, H)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 FIRST INFORMATIONAL ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/13/2013. (Kusamura, W)
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING Scheduling Conference: Parties to have a telephonic conference on 11/6/2013 at 1:30pm to discuss potential for settlement. Scheduling Conference set for November 26, 2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/6/2013. (Herman, H)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Adopting 19 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/3/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Granting Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Default 16 , 17 ; ORDER Vacating Findings and Recommendations filed May 13, 2013 15 ; ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment as Moot, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/16/13. Referred to Judge Ishii; 15-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
May 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Construing Defendant's Letter as a Motion to Set Aside Default and Ordering Plaintiff to File Response 16 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/20/13. (Verduzco, M)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's Application for Default Judgment 11 . Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due within 15 days of service of this recommendation. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/9/2013. (Herman, H)
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for an Order Continuing Initial Scheduling Conference 5 ; and ORDER: Initial SCHEDULING CONFERENCE is continued from 12/13/2012 to January 29, 2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/7/2012. (Herman, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Aranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruben Garcia Aranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?