Lawley v. California Department of Developmental Services
Plaintiff: Mark Lawley
Defendant: California Department of Developmental Services
Case Number: 1:2012cv01617
Filed: October 2, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER to Dismiss and Close Action, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/31/13. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION for Modification of Pre-Trial Scheduling Order; ORDER - 1) non-expert discovery by 2/14/2014; 2) Expert discovery by 3/21/2014; 3) file non-dispositive motions by 3/28/2014; 4) non-dispostive motions hearing by 4/25/2014; 5) dispos itive motions filed by 5/1/2014; 6) dispositive motions hearing by 6/12/2014; 7) SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE set for September 18, 2013 (was 9/5/2013) at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe; 8) PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for August 6, 2014 (was 4/9/2014) at 08:15 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. 9) JURY TRIAL (10-14 days) set for September 16, 2014 (was 5/20/2014) at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/2/2013. (Herman, H)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER to Elect Referral of Action to Voluntary Dispute Resolution Program (VDRP) Pursuant to Local Rule 271, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/31/2013. (Herman, H)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Stipulaltion for Protecitve Order and PROTECTIVE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/9/2013. (Herman, H)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER (Fed.R.Civ.P 16), signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/11/2013. (Initial Disclosures: 2/1/2013, Non Expert Discovery ddl: 9/30/2013, Expert Discovery ddl: 12/6/2013, Non-Dispositive Motion Filing Dddl: 12/13/2013, Disp ositive Motion Filing ddl: 1/15/2014, Settlement Conference set for 9/5/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe, Pretrial Conference set for 4/9/2014 at 08:15 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill, & Jury Trial (10-14 days) set for 5/20/2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill.) (Gaumnitz, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawley v. California Department of Developmental Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Lawley
Represented By: Nicholas John Scardigli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Developmental Services
Represented By: Amy Lindsey-Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?