Riddle v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Rose Riddle
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2012cv01680
Filed: October 11, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on March 29, 2016. [Doc. 24] (Munoz, I)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees, Expenses, and Costs, document 22 , pursuant to the stipulation of the parties. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 11/22/2013. (Rooney, M)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Reversing Agency's Denial of Benefits and Remanding for Further Proceedings, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 8/29/13. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
October 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Authorizing Service of Complaint; ORDERED Clerk of Court to Issue the Summons and Scheduling Order to Plaintiff's Attorney, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 10/30/12. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, WITH LEAVE TO AMEND WITHIN THIRTY DAYS, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 10/16/12. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riddle v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Riddle
Represented By: Kelsey Mackenzie Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?