Corra v. Energizer Holdings Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Aida Corra
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Energizer Holdings Inc. and Playtex Products Inc
Case Number: 1:2012cv01736
Filed: October 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/01/2014. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATION and ORDER to Further Extend Discovery and Briefing Schedules. Last Day for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admissions, First Set of Requests for Productions, and First Set of Interrogatories is 10/10/2014. Mid-Discovery Status Report due by no later than 10/23/2014. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 10/30/2014, at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Deadline for Class Discovery is 11/7/201 4. Last day for filing Class Certification Motion is 12/5/2014. Last day for Plaintiff to produce and for Defendants to depose class certification experts is 1/5/2015. Last day for filing Opposition to Class Certification Motion is 1/19/2015. Las t day for Defendants to produce and for Plaintiff to depose class certification experts is 2/20/2015. Last day for filing Reply to Class Certification Opposition is 4/3/2015. Class Certification Hearing is set for 5/11/2015, at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/5/2014. (Timken, A)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION and ORDER to EXTEND Discovery and Briefing Schedules. Last Day for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admissions, First Set of Requests for Productions, and First Set of Interrogatories is 8/26/201 4. Mid-Discovery Status Report due by no later than 9/11/2014. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 9/18/2014, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Deadline for Class Discovery is 9/23/2014. Last day fo r filing Class Certification Motion is 10/21/2014. Last day for Plaintiff to produce and for Defendants to depose class certification experts is 11/21/2014. Last day for filing Opposition to Class Certification Motion is 12/5/2014. Last day for Defen dants to produce and for Plaintiff to depose class certification experts is 1/6/2015. Last day for filing Reply to Class Certification Opposition is 2/17/2015. Class Certification Hearing set for 3/23/2015, at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/3/2014. (Timken, A)
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATION and ORDER to Further Extend Discovery and Briefing Schedules. Last Day for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admissions, First Set of Requests for Productions, and First Set of Interrogatories is 6/24/2014. Mid-Discovery Status Report due by no later than 7/3/2014. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 7/10/2014, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Deadline for Class Discovery is 7/25/2014. La st day for filing Class Certification Motion is 8/22/2014. Last day for Plaintiff to produce and for Defendants to depose class certification experts is 9/23/2014. Last day for filing Opposition to Class Certification Motion is 10/7/2014. Last day for Defendants to produce and for Plaintiff to depose class certification experts is 11/7/2014. Last day for filing Reply to Class Certification Opposition is 12/19/2014. Class Certification Hearing set for 1/26/2015, at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/22/2014. (Timken, A)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the extension of the discovery and briefing schedule as follows: Mid-Discovery Status Report due 5/6/2014; Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 5/13/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Shei la K. Oberto; Class Discovery due by 5/23/2014; Class Certification Motion to be filed by 6/20/2014; last day for plaintiff to produce and for defendants to depose class certification experts, if any, identified in plaintiff's Class Certificatio n Motion is 7/22/2014; Response to Class Certification Motion due by 8/5/2014; last day for defendants to produce and for plaintiff to depose class certification experts, if any, identified in defendants' opposition to plaintiff's Class Cer tification Motion is 9/5/2014; Reply to Class Certification Motion is due by 10/24/2014; and the Class Certification Motion Hearing set for 11/24/2014 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/5/2014. (Rooney, M)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 JOINT Document Collection and Production Protocol; ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/6/2013. (Gaumnitz, R)
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions/Stipulations to Amended Complaint due by 12/20/2013; Initial Disclosures shall be exchanged by no later than 11/27/2013; Class Discovery shall be completed by 3/24/2014. Class Certification Motion shall be filed by 4/7/20 14; Opposition shall be filed by: 5/23/2014; Replies shall be filed by 8/11/2014. Class Certification Hearing set for 9/8/2014, at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/7/2013. (Timken, A)
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER re 55 Motion for Reconsideration or Certification for Interlocutory Appeal, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/8/2013. Motion DENIED. (Marrujo, C)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER VACATING 55 Motion for Reconsideration Hearing set for 9/23/2013 and Taking Under Submission, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/18/2013. (Kusamura, W)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION and ORDER regarding filing of second amended complaint. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within 30 days of the Court's ruling on Defendants' pending Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. 55). Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/9/2013. (Timken, A)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER RE: 19 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and for 30 Leave to File Second Amended Complaint signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 08/01/2013. (Flores, E)
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER VACATING Hearing Date of March 11, 2013; Order Setting Briefing Schedule and Order Taking Matters Under Submission, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/8/2013. (Kusamura, W)
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER to CONTINUE mandatory schedulin conference. The Scheduling Conference currently set for 1/31/2013, is CONTINUED to 4/18/2013, at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties' Joint Scheduling Report shall be filed no later than April 11, 2013, and shall also be emailed in Word or WordPerfect format to the Court at skoorders@caed.uscourts.gov. Telephonic appearances for the Scheduling Conference are APPROVED and e ncouraged. Any parties wishing to appear telephonically for the Scheduling Conference SHALL indicate this in the caption of their Joint Scheduling Report and all parties appearing telephonically shall coordinate one conference call to the Court at (559) 499-5790 at the time and date for the Scheduling Conference. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/17/2013. (Timken, A)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/18/2012. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corra v. Energizer Holdings Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Energizer Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Playtex Products Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aida Corra
Represented By: Patricia N. Syverson
Represented By: Todd D. Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?