Rogers v. Emerson, et al.
Plaintiff: Charles A. Rogers
Defendant: K W Goss, N Emerson and M. Jones
Case Number: 1:2012cv01827
Filed: November 7, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Regarding Plaintiff's 59 Motion for Summary Judgment and Defendants' 61 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment; Thirty Day Objection Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 5/9/2014. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 6/16/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER DENYING 46 Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/17/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 32 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/4/13: Defendant Emerson SHALL submit supplemental responses to Interrogatories 5, 6 and 7, Set Three, within 21 days of the date of service of this order. (Hellings, J)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Request To Withdraw Motion As Moot (Document 50 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/21/2013. (Fahrney, E)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying 28 Motion to Compel and denying 36 Motion to grant motion to compel signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/31/2013. (Lundstrom, T)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting Defendants' 24 Motion to Deem Respones to Discovery Timely, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/3/13. (Gonzalez, R)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Request to Conduct Plaintiff's Deposition Via Video Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/12/13. (Hellings, J)
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Denying 18 Motion for Reconsideration signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/15/13. (Verduzco, M)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DIRECTING Defendants to File Responsive Pleading Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/24/13: Defendants Goss and Emerson are ORDERED to file a responsive pleading within thirty (30) days of the date of service of this order. (Hellings, J)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ADOPTING 12 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and Dismissing Certain Claims and Defendant Jones, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/19/13. M. Jones terminated. (Verduzco, M)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of Certain Claims and Defendants, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 5/17/2013, referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 3 Motion for Screening Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A, signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 11/19/2012. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. Emerson, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K W Goss
Represented By: Preeti Kaur Bajwa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N Emerson
Represented By: Preeti Kaur Bajwa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Jones
Represented By: Preeti Kaur Bajwa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles A. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?