United States of America v. Approximately $10,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $10,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 1:2012cv01863
Filed: November 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER To Close Action (Doc. 23 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/8/2013. CASE CLOSED.(Fahrney, E)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Adopting FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; Granting The United States of America's Motion For Default Judgment (Docs. 19 , 22 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/26/2013. (Fahrney, E)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Default Judgment 19 . Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due within 14 days of service of this recommendation. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/29/2013. (Herman, H)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER continuing Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/12/2013. (Scheduling Conference currently set for 2/27/2013 has been CONTINUED to 5/29/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe) (Figueroa, O)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Regarding Clerk's Issuance of Warrant for Arrest of Articles In Rem signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/16/2012. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $10,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Heather Mardel Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $10,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?