Lopez Cruz et al v. El Rancho Farms et al
Plaintiff: Angel Lopez Cruz and Angelica Alvarez
Defendant: El Rancho Farms and Garza Contracting, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv01934
Filed: November 28, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Granting Final Approval of Class Settlement 56 ; FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Granting in Part Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney Fees 61 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/21/2015. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER re 54 Stipulation to Continue Deadlines, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/10/2015. Final Approval and Fairness Hearing CONTINUED to 7/17/2015 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER APPROVING 52 THE AMENDED CLASS NOTICE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/29/2015. (Hall, S)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER CONTINUING the Deadlines Related to the Class Notice Based Upon 50 the Stipulation of the Parties; ORDER CONTINUING the Final Approval and Fitness Hearing to June 18, 2015 at 09:00 AM at 510 19th Street (JLT), Bakersfield; ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiffs to File an Amended Class Notice Packet, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/12/2015. (Hall, S)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' Request for Approval of the Amended Class Notice, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/8/2014. (Hall, S)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DENYING Plaintiffs' Request for Approval of the Revised Class Notice; ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiffs to File an Amended Class Notice No Later Than December 5, 2014, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/4/2014. (Hall, S)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING 38 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/26/2014. Final Approval and Fairness Hearing set for 3/20/2015 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER extending time to file motion for preliminary approval of class settlement. signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/4/2014. (Nazaroff, H)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER AFTER 35 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/4/2014. Dismissal filing deadline 8/22/2014. (Hall, S)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER vacating hearing of May 20, 2013 and taking matter under submission. signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/16/13. (Nazaroff, H)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Vacating Hearing Date Of April 29, 2013 And Taking Matter Under Submission, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/24/2013. (Fahrney, E)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER CONTINUING Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/22/2013. Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/2/2013 at 09:30 AM at the United States Courthouse, 510 19th Street, Bakersfield, before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez Cruz et al v. El Rancho Farms et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Lopez Cruz
Represented By: Stanley S. Mallison
Represented By: Hector Rodriguez Martinez
Represented By: Marco A. Palau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelica Alvarez
Represented By: Stanley S. Mallison
Represented By: Hector Rodriguez Martinez
Represented By: Marco A. Palau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Rancho Farms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garza Contracting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?