Villescas v. Dotson et al
Plaintiff: Alberto Villescas
Defendant: M. T. Dotson, W. Tucker, D. Fischer, C. Hernandez and J. Madrigal
Case Number: 1:2012cv02068
Filed: December 21, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Continue Trial and Scheduled Deadlines as MOOT 116 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/21/17. (Hellings, J)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Close Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/13/17. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER & WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Transport Inmate Alberto Villescas, CDCR #P-16275 on March 9, 2017 at 1:30 PM, before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison, Ctrm #4, 501 I Street, Sacramento, CA, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/9/17. (Hellings, J)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Plaintiff's 99 Motion for Attendance of Incarcerated Witnesses at Trial signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/3/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER Setting Settlment Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/24/17: Settlement Conference set for 3/9/2017 at 01:30 PM in Sacramento, before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison, Ctrm #4. (Hellings, J)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER SETTING Telephonic Hearing Regarding Defendants' Request to Continue the Trial Date, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/12/17. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 1/20/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone.) (Marrujo, C)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Videoconference and Use of Court's Electronic Filing System 96 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/16/16. (Hellings, J)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/19/16. Telephonic Pretrial Confirmation Hearing: March 10, 2017, at 9:30 a.m. Telephonic Motions in Limine Hearing: April 7, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. Jury Trial: April 19, 2017, at 8:30 a.m. in Courtroom 9 (SAB); 2-3 Days. (Verduzco, M)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Setting Telephonic Conference Hearing on October 17, 2016 at 3:15 P.M., signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/6/16. (Verduzco, M)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Defendants' 57 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/19/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO SUBMIT COPY OF DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT AS REFERENCED IN NOTICE OF LODGING FILED SEPTEMBER 2, 2015 54 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/19/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction and Motion for Reconsideration 69 , 70 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/1/15. (Hellings, J)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Stay and GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to File an Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 68 , 71 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/30/15: Thirty-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Overruling Plaintiff's 65 Objections to Defendants' Request to Modify the Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/5/15. (Verduzco, M)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Denying 60 Plaintiff's Motion to Supplement the Record as Unnecessary, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/20/15. (Gonzalez, R)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Third Request to Extend Dispositive Motion Deadline By Seven Days 55 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/4/15: Deadline EXTENDED to September 10, 2015. (Hellings, J)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Granting Defendants' Second 51 Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and Extending the Dispositive Motion Deadline to September 3, 2015, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/5/15. (Verduzco, M)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Extension Of Time And Motion To Supplement The Record (ECF Nos. 48 , 49 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/4/2015. (Fahrney, E)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Denying 43 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and Denying 47 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of Denial of Third Request for Extension of the Discovery Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/22/15. (Gonzalez, R)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and Extending the Dispositive Motion Deadline to August 4, 2015 45 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/7/15. (Hellings, J)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Third Motion to Extend the Time for Discovery and Filing of Dispositive Motion Deadlines 39 , 40 , 41 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/27/15. (Hellings, J)
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR COURT ORDER AND APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL AND STRIKING DISCOVERY REQUEST FROM THE RECORD re 27 , 28 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/5/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO MODIFY THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND SETTING NEW DISCOVERY AND DISPOSITIVE MOTION DEADLINES re 35 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/3/2015. (Discovery due by 5/5/2015. Dispositive Motions filed by 7/5/2015). (Lundstrom, T)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting Defendants' Motion to Take Plaintiff's Deposition by Videoconference 30 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/18/14. (Verduzco, M)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's 27 Motion for Court Order and Appointment of Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/1/2014, referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within 30 Days. (Marrujo, C)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DISMISSING Certain Claims and Defendants, and REFERRING Matter Back to Magistrate Judge for Initiation of Service of Process 10 , 13 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/17/14. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villescas v. Dotson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto Villescas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. T. Dotson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Madrigal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?