Castrence v. Doe et al
Plaintiff: Redentor C. Castrence
Defendant: Jane Doe and John Doe
Case Number: 1:2012cv02075
Filed: December 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING 17 Motion for Relief, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/30/2014. (Marrujo, C)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DISMISSING Action for Failure to Prosecute, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 8/8/2013. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Comply With a Court Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 7/8/2013. Show Cause Response Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Partially Granting Plaintiff's 4 Motion for a Case Number and to Update his Address signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 02/26/2013. Response due by 3/18/2013. (Flores, E)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion To Update His Address (ECF No. 6 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/13/2013. (Fahrney, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castrence v. Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Redentor C. Castrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?