Valley View Health Care, Inc., et al v. Chapman, et al
Plaintiff: Valley View Health Care, Inc., Stonebrook Convalescent Center, Lifehouse Parkview Operations, LLC, Beverly Healthcare - California, Inc., CF Modesto, LLC dba Country Villa Modesto Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, Avalon Care Center - Merced Franciscan, LLC and California Association of Health Facilities
Defendant: Ronald Chapman and California Department of Public Health
Case Number: 1:2013cv00036
Filed: January 8, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1 U.S. Arbitration Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER RE 58 Summary Judgment Decision and Judgment Thereon signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 01/15/2014. CASE CLOSED. (Flores, E)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER on AARP'S JOINDER 82 REQUEST signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 01/09/2014. (Flores, E)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER TO REVISE SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING AND TO VACATE HEARING signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on December 9, 2013. (Munoz, I)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of time to 11/27/2013 to file any pre-trial motions or cross motions for summary judgment or summary adjudication. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/1/2013. (Rooney, M)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER on Stipulation Extending Time for Plaintiff's Reponses to Defendant's First Set of Written Discovery 51 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/18/2013. (Herman, H)
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER on Proposed Intervenors' Motion to Intervene as Defendants (California Advocates for Nursing Home Reform and Glenn Partrick by and though his convervators, Neil Sulborshi and Jeanne Patrick) (Doc. 36). (1) Proposed Intervenors' Moti on to Intervene is DENIED (Doc. 36); (2) Proposed Intervenors, however, are GRANTED leave to file one amicus brief on the specific issues in this litigation. Such briefing shall be filed not later than 21 calendar days before any dispositive motion hearing date set by either party. The length of the brief shall comply with the page limitations set in the Standing Order of the assigned judge. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/27/2013. (Herman, H)
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 JOINT STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on July 30, 2013. (Munoz, I)
July 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Time for Defendants' Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Written Discovery: extended from 7/15/2013 to July 30, 2013. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/11/2013. (Herman, H)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 JOINT STIPULATION And ORDER To Extend Time For Initial Disclosures, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/12/2013. (Filing Deadline: 5/14/2013) (Fahrney, E)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DENYING 19 Motion to Dismiss;ORDERED Defendants Ronald Chapman, M.D. and CDPH, no later than April 16, 2013, to file and serve a answer to the complaint, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 04/2/2013. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER To Extend Time For Defendants To Respond to Comlaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/29/2013. (IT IS HEREBY SO ORDERED that Defendants have a 20-day extension of time from 1/31/2013, to and including 2/20/2013, in which to file and serve a responsive pleading to Plaintiffs complaint.)(Gaumnitz, R)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER to Dismiss Defendant State of California signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 01/16/2013. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valley View Health Care, Inc., et al v. Chapman, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valley View Health Care, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Jason Kiepen
Represented By: Joseph R. LaMagna
Represented By: Katherine R. Miller
Represented By: Mark Emerson Reagan
Represented By: Felicia Y. Sze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stonebrook Convalescent Center
Represented By: Scott Jason Kiepen
Represented By: Joseph R. LaMagna
Represented By: Katherine R. Miller
Represented By: Mark Emerson Reagan
Represented By: Felicia Y. Sze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lifehouse Parkview Operations, LLC
Represented By: Scott Jason Kiepen
Represented By: Joseph R. LaMagna
Represented By: Katherine R. Miller
Represented By: Mark Emerson Reagan
Represented By: Felicia Y. Sze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Healthcare - California, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Jason Kiepen
Represented By: Joseph R. LaMagna
Represented By: Katherine R. Miller
Represented By: Mark Emerson Reagan
Represented By: Felicia Y. Sze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CF Modesto, LLC dba Country Villa Modesto Nursing & Rehabilitation Center
Represented By: Scott Jason Kiepen
Represented By: Joseph R. LaMagna
Represented By: Katherine R. Miller
Represented By: Mark Emerson Reagan
Represented By: Felicia Y. Sze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avalon Care Center - Merced Franciscan, LLC
Represented By: Scott Jason Kiepen
Represented By: Joseph R. LaMagna
Represented By: Katherine R. Miller
Represented By: Mark Emerson Reagan
Represented By: Felicia Y. Sze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Association of Health Facilities
Represented By: Scott Jason Kiepen
Represented By: Joseph R. LaMagna
Represented By: Katherine R. Miller
Represented By: Mark Emerson Reagan
Represented By: Felicia Y. Sze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Chapman
Represented By: Pauline W Gee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Public Health
Represented By: Ashante Latrice Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?