Moniz v. City of Delano, California
Plaintiff: Robin Moniz
Defendant: City of Delano, California
Case Number: 1:2013cv00093
Filed: January 17, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER CLOSING CASE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/19/2015. CASE CLOSED. (Hall, S)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed for Failure to File the Stipulated Request for Dismissal, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/14/2015. Show Cause Response due by 5/29/2015. (Hall, S)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING 50 Stipulation for an Extension of Time to Dismiss the Matter, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/13/2015. Dismissal filing deadline 4/10/2015. (Hall, S)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING 48 Stipulation to Continue Deadline to File Dispositional Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/17/2015. (Hall, S)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER AFTER NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT 46 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/13/2015. (Hall, S)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER on 36 Motions in Limine, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/8/2015. The hearing on the Motions in Limine, set for 1/12/2015 at 09:30 AM, is VACATED. (Hall, S)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER RE COURTROOM DECORUM signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/5/2015. (Rooney, M)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 PRETRIAL ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/9/2014. Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 1/12/2015 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DENYING 24 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/5/2014. (Hall, S)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DISMISSING Plaintiff's Third, Fourth, and Fifth Claims for Relief; ORDER VACATING THE HEARING DATE of June 30, 2014 and DIRECTING the Parties to File Supplemental Briefing re 24 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/27/2014. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moniz v. City of Delano, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Delano, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Moniz
Represented By: Randall Martin Rumph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?