Hood v. Mims et al
Plaintiff: Albert Lee Hood
Defendant: Margaret Mims, Chuna, Taylor, Wibbles and Zavala
Case Number: 1:2013cv00108
Filed: January 24, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 JUDGMENT dated *5/16/18* pursuant to order. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE and ORDER that Plaintiff Albert Lee Hood, Reg No. 69049-097, Is No Longer Needed as a Witness in These Proceedings, and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is Discharged, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/16/18. (Gonzalez, R)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER & Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Transport Albert Lee Hood, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 05/15/2018. (Flores, E)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER and Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Transport Albert Lee Hood, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/19/18. (Marrujo, C)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 PRETRIAL ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 03/05/2018. (Case Management Deadline: 4/27/2018, Filing Deadline: 4/27/2018, Motions filed by 4/13/2018, Jury Trial set for 5/15/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe, Motion Hearing set for 5/7/2018 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe) (Martin-Gill, S)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 SECOND SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/16/2017. Plaintiff's Pretrial Statement due 2/5/2018; Defendant's Pretrial Statement due 02/19/2018; Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing set for 3/5/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe; Jury Trial set for 5/15/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe.(Flores, E)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 62 Motion Regarding Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/6/17. (Gonzalez, R)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER ADOPTING 58 Findings and Recommendations, DENYING Defendant's 48 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/18/17. (Marrujo, C)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed on January 6, 2017 48 , be Denied ;referred to Judge O'Neill, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 08/28/17. Objections to F&R due by 9/14/2017 (Martin-Gill, S)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Third 52 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/1/17. (Gonzalez, R)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 SECOND INFORMATIONAL ORDER - Notice and Warning of Requirements for Opposing Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/9/17. (Marrujo, C)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Adopting 43 Findings and Recommendations; ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' 34 Motion to Dismiss; ORDER Directing Defendant Chuna to File an Answer, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/24/16. Zavala (C/O), Taylor (Sgt.) and Wibbles (Corporal) terminated. Answer Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 34 MOTION to DISMISS be denied signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/14/2016. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 2/19/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to 34 Motion to Dismiss, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/29/15. Thirty-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DENYING Motion to Dismiss as MOOT 24 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/27/15. (Hellings, J)
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ADOPTING 13 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; THAT THIS ACTION PROCEED ONLY AGAINST DEFENDANTS CHUNA, TAYLOR, WIBBLES, AND ZAVALA, ON PLAINTIFF'S EIGHTH AMENDMENT MEDICAL CLAIMS AND DISMISSING ALL OTHER CLAIMS AND DEFENDANTS signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/7/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Denying 14 Motion for Appointment of Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 07/11/14. (Gonzalez, R)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that this Action Proceed Only Against Defendants Chuna, Taylor, Wibbles, and Zavala, on Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment Medical Claims, and that All Other Claims and Defendants be Dismissed, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 07/03/14. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Twenty-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATIONS That This Action Be Dismissed For Failure To Prosecute And Failure To Obey A Court Order, Objections Due In Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/18/2014. F&R's referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 7/21/2014.(Fahrney, E)
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Denying Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (Doc. 7 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/1/2014. (Fahrney, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hood v. Mims et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Lee Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wibbles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zavala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?