Sugita v. Parker, et al.
Plaintiff: Janice Sugita
Defendant: B Parker, P Poole, S. Childs, J. Villa, R K Mitchell and H Longia
Case Number: 1:2013cv00118
Filed: January 25, 2013
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER on Defendant's Motions for Summary Judgment 54 , 57 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/23/16. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 PRETRIAL ORDER signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/2/15. Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing set for 11/16/2015 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Motions in Limine Filing Deadline: 11/18/2015; Opposition to Motions in Limine Filing Deadline: 11/25/2015; Jury Trial set for 12/1/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Verduzco, M)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Regarding Defendant's 49 Request for Clarification re Motion to Dismiss, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/2/15. (Verduzco, M)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Discharging 42 Order to Show Cause and Setting Deadline for Defendant's Pretrial Statement, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/5/15. Trial Confirmation Hearing set for 11/16/2015 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Gonzalez, R)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Denying 43 Motion for Reconsideration; ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part 44 Motion to Modify Deadline to File Pretrial Statement, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/30/15. (Gonzalez, R)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Vacating Pretrial Conference Date re 37 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/28/15. (Gonzalez, R)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Case Should Not Be Dismissed With Prejudice for Failure to Comply With Court Order 37 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/16/15: Fourteen (14) Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Requesting Confidential Statements re Case Selection for Prisoner Settlement Program signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 8/14/2015. Confidential statements due within fifteen (15) days. cc: ADR Division - USDC Sacramento. (Jessen, A)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER ADOPTING 34 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS TO (1) GRANT DEFENDANT SALINAS'S 28 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND (2) GRANT DEFENDANT LONGIA'S 27 PARTIAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/30/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to: 1) Grant Defendant Salinas' 28 Motion for Summary Judgment, 2) Grant Defendant Longia's Partial 27 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 5/15/15, referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff To File Opposition To Defendant Salinas' Motion For Summary Judgment (ECF No. 28 ), Notice And Warning Of Requirements For Opposing Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment, Twenty-One (21) Day Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/30/2015. (Opposition Deadline: 4/23/2015) (Fahrney, E)
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DENYING Defendants' Motion to Extend Deadline to File Unenumerated Rule 12(b) Motion 21 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/21/14. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sugita v. Parker, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Sugita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P Poole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Childs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Villa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R K Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H Longia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?