Maddox v. Yates, et al.
Plaintiff: David Maddox
Defendant: James A. Yates and Arnellas
Case Number: 1:2013cv00171
Filed: February 4, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION, With Prejudice, for Failure to Prosecute and Failure to Obey Court Order; ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Terminate Pending Motions and Close Case signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/30/2016. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Action should not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute and Failure to Obey Court Order; Show Cause Response in Fourteen (14) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/1/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF to File Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to 45 Motion for Summary Judgment Within Thirty (30) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/20/2016. (Jessen, A)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER to Recaption Case; "LVN Arnellas" corrected to read B. Ornellas, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 03/16/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING 39 Defendant's Request to Modify the Scheduling Order to Extend the Dispositive Motion Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/30/2015. Discovery due by 1/25/2016. Dispositive Motions filed by 4/6/2016. (Jessen, A)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER IMPOSING SERVICE COSTS on Defendant Arnellas and Requiring Him to Reimburse USM $329.44 Within Thirty (30) Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/20/2015. (Jessen, A)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER PROVIDING DEFENDANT WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO SHOW GOOD CAUSE FOR FAILING TO WAIVE SERVICE signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/4/2015. Show Cause Response due by 4/6/2015.(Lundstrom, T)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying 19 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/28/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING 13 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/17/2013. (Jessen, A)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Denying 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/12/13. (Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maddox v. Yates, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Maddox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnellas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?