Gilbert v. Chase Home Finance, LLC et al.
Plaintiff: James D. Gilbert
Defendant: Chase Home Finance, LLC and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00265
Filed: February 21, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER on Defendants' 16 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 07/31/2013. CASE CLOSED. (Flores, E)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER on plaintiff's motion to continue hearing. signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/25/13. (Nazaroff, H)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER VACATING Hearing and Taking Matter Under Submission, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/23/2013. The previously set hearing date of July 29, 2013, is VACATED. (Marrujo, C)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH LEAVE TO AMEND ;ORDER GRANTING 5 Motion to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 05/28/2013. (14) DAY DEADLINE (Martin-Gill, S)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER VACATING Hearing and Taking Matter Under Submission, and Order on Motion for Telephonic Appearance, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/25/2013. (Kusamura, W) (Main Document 12 replaced on 4/25/2013) (Kusamura, W).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilbert v. Chase Home Finance, LLC et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James D. Gilbert
Represented By: Megan Ann Dailey
Represented By: Michael James Yesk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Home Finance, LLC
Represented By: Alexander Casnocha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Alexander Casnocha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?