Pleasant v. Turner et al
Plaintiff: Terry K Pleasant
Defendant: Michelle Turner, R. Rusmussen and Matthew Serratto
Case Number: 1:2013cv00329
Filed: March 7, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING 21 Motion Voluntary Dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 04/27/15. CLOSED CASE (Martin-Gill, S)
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING Second 19 Motion for Extension of time, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/23/2015. (Kusamura, W)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal Without Leave to Amend re 14 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/13/2015. Objections to F&R due by 3/19/2015. (Martinez, A)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING plaintiff's request for an extension of time to file an amended complaint, document 11 . Plaintiff's first amended complaint is to be filed on or before 1/27/2014. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/22/2013. (Rooney, M)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Regarding the Legal Sufficiency of Plaintiff's Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/28/2013. If Plaintiff intends to proceed with this case in federal court, Plaintiff shall file a First Amended Complaint within thirty (30) days of the date of service of this order. (Martinez, A)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INFORMATIONAL ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/29/2013. (Martinez, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pleasant v. Turner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry K Pleasant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Rusmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Serratto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?