Cotta et al v. Robinson et al
Plaintiff: Yvonne Cotta and Madison Cotta
Defendant: Dave Robinson, Dave Putnam, S. Henderson and Kings County
Case Number: 1:2013cv00359
Filed: March 12, 2013
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER regarding 122 Petition for approval of settlement and compromise of minors' claims signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/17/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER VACATING Hearing on March 30, 2018. ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of and Relief from Judgment in Favor of Defendant Sgt. Shari Henderson. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/21/2018. (Herman, H)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER to Recaption Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/6/2018. (Hellings, J)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER re Defendants' 76 Motion for Reconsideration of Memorandum Decision and Order re Defendants' 60 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 02/09/15. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER re: Plaintiffs' Application for Appointment of Yvonne Cotta as guardian ad litem for Kaylianna Cotta, in her capacity as representative of the estate of John Cotta, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 01/12/15. (Kaylianna Cotta added)(Martin-Gill, S)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER RE DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Doc. 60) signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on January 7, 2015. (Munoz, I)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER DENYING Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, document 48 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 8/27/2014. (Rooney, M)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DENYING Defendants' 38 Motion for Abatement and GRANTING Plaintiff's 41 Motion for Leave to Amend signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 5/28/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 2/26/2014. (Rooney, M)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Stipulation and Order extending the time for Defendants to file their response to Plaintiffs' Corrected First Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 8/21/2013. (Figueroa, O)
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DENYING defendants' Motion for Reconsideration, document {21]. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 8/14/2013. (Rooney, M)
July 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING plaintiffs' application for the appointment of Yvonne Cotta, as guardian ad litem for Madison Cotta, document 19 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/5/2013. (Rooney, M)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING, in part, and DENYING, in part, defendants' Motion to Dismiss, document 9 . Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint within forty-five days of service of this Order. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 6/24/2013. (Rooney, M)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting 3 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 3/15/13. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cotta et al v. Robinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Cotta
Represented By: Kevin Gerard Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madison Cotta
Represented By: Kevin Gerard Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Robinson
Represented By: Roy C. Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Putnam
Represented By: Roy C. Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Henderson
Represented By: Roy C. Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kings County
Represented By: Roy C. Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?