Lorigo v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Carlos M. Lorigo
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2013cv00405
Filed: March 19, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING 27 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff's counsel's motion for an award of attorney's fees pursuant to Section 406(b) in the amount of $12,562 is GRANTED subject to an offset of $3,500 for EAJA fees previously awarded. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/27/2015. (Timken, A)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER that PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OR STATEMENT ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 10, 2015. Plaintiff's counsel shall file a supplemental declaration or statement that supports Plaintiff's past due benefit award, which Plaintiff's counsel indicates is $50,249.00. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/28/2015. (Timken, A)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order awarding Equal Access to Justice Act attorneys fees and expenses pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2412(d), signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/21/2014. (Figueroa, O)
April 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/17/14. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING Nunc Pro Tunc Leave for Plaintiff to File Opening Brief Out of Time 20 . Plaintiff is granted, nunc pro tunc, leave to file the opening brief on January 7, 2014; Defendant's responsive brief shall be filed no later than February 6, 2014; and Plaintiff's reply brief shall be filed no later than February 13, 2014. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/8/2014. (Timken, A)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Briefing Schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/4/2013. (Pursuant to the parties' 18 stipulation, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiff shall file an opening brief no later than 1/6/2014; 2. Defendant shall file a responsive brief no later than 2/5/2014; and 3. Plaintiff may file an optional reply brief no later than 2/12/2014.)(Gaumnitz, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lorigo v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos M. Lorigo
Represented By: Steven Gilbert Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Paul Sachelari, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?