Gutierrez v. Gutierrez
Plaintiff: G. J. Gutierrez
Defendant: A. Gutierrez
Case Number: 1:2013cv00421
Filed: March 22, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER directing Clerk of Court to close case pursuant to parties' Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal 153 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/29/2017. CASE CLOSE.(Lundstrom, T)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Inmate Gerard J. Gutierrez, CDCR #T-35099 before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney at the U.S. District Court, 501 I Street, Sacramento, CA 95814 in Courtroom #24 on October 30, 2017 at 9:30 a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/24/17. (Gonzalez, R)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER Regarding 129 Plaintiff's Motion for Attendance of Incarcerated Witnesses at Trial and 138 Supplemental Motion for Witnesses signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/28/2017. Expert Disclosures due by 10/12/2017. (Jessen, A)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER REGARDING Plaintiff's Objection to Pretrial Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/19/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER REGARDING Defendant's Objection to Pretrial Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/15/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/6/2017 setting Settlement Conference for 10/30/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) U.S. District Court 501 I Street, Sacramento, CA 95814 before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Lundstrom, T)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER DENYING 125 Plaintiff's Third Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/17/2017. (Jessen, A)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/15/2017 setting Telephonic Trial Conference Hearing on 6/22/2017 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Lundstrom, T)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER denying 112 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/15/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER reassigning case to Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/7/2017. The new case number is 1:13-cv-00421-SAB-(PC).(Lundstrom, T)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER adopting 103 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and denying 98 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/7/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 41(b) 98 , be DENIED re 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by G. J. Gutierrez ; referred to Judge Drozd, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/1/2016. Objections to F&R due (14-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER directing Defense Counsel to file status report regarding Plaintiff's medical condition within 14-Days re 97 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/16/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER GRANTING 87 Defendant's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses and ORDER EXTENDING Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline (Docs. 94 & 95 ) signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/20/2016. Discovery due by 8/15/2016. Dispositive Motions filed by 9/16/2016. (Jessen, A)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER GRANTING 88 Defendant's Request to Extend Time to File Dispositive Motions signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/13/2016. Dispositive Motions filed by 7/14/2016. (Jessen, A)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER ADOPTING 72 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DENYING 67 Plaintiff's Motion for Declaratory Relief or Preliminary Injunction signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/29/2016. (Jessen, A)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER GRANTING 83 Motion to Extend Time to File Dispositive Motions, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/16/2016. (Dispositive Motions Due May 16, 2016) (Martin-Gill, S)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS re Plaintiff's 67 Motion for Declaratory Relief or Preliminary Injunction, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/14/15. Referred to Judge Drozd; 30-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Re Motions To Compel (ECF Nos. 57 , 58 , 60 , 63 ), ORDER Granting Defendant's Motion To Extend Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline (ECF No. 69 ), Dispositive Motion Deadline: March 16, 2016, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/7/2015. (Fahrney, E)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DENYING 59 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/23/2015. (Jessen, A)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER DENYING 55 Motion to Postpone Deposition as MOOT signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/19/2015. (Jessen, A)
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER denying 54 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/14/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Request As Premature (Doc. 46 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/29/2014. (Fahrney, E)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Striking Plaintiff's Notice Of Lodgment (Doc. 42 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/4/2014. (Fahrney, E)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER ADOPTING 37 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER DENYING 20 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or Based on Qualified Immunity; and ORDER Requiring Defendant to File Answer Within Thirty (30) Days signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/22/2014. (Jessen, A)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending That Defendant's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion To Dismiss For Failure To State A Claim, Or Based On Qualified Immunity, Be Denied (Doc. 20 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/17/2014. F&R's referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 10/20/2014. (Fahrney, E)
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER STRIKING Inmate William Milton's Response as Improper Filing 30 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/13/14. (Hellings, J)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 28 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's 24 Opposition; ORDER STRIKING Plaintiff's 24 Opposition for Lack of Signature, With Leave to File an Opposition Bearing His Signature Within Twenty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/1/2014. (Marrujo, C)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING 23 Motion to Correct Due Date signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/3/2014. (Jessen, A)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING 15 Plaintiff's Motion for Declaratory Relief or Preliminary Injunction, for Want of Jurisdiction signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/8/2014. (Jessen, A)
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER STRIKING 12 Application for Lack of Signature signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/21/2014. (Jessen, A)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING 10 Motion for Court Order signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/4/2014. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gutierrez v. Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. J. Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?