Davis v. Commissioner of Social Security

Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Shanda L. Davis
Case Number: 1:2013cv00454
Filed: March 27, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 21, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Awarding Equal Access to Justice Act Attorney Fees and Expenses Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2412(d) signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/21/2014. (Martinez, A)
December 23, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER to Voluntary Remand and to Entry of Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/23/2013. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
October 31, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION for Extension of Time and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/31/2013. (Martinez, A)
October 2, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 14 Stay of Proceedings signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/2/2013. (Martinez, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Patrick William Snyder, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanda L. Davis
Represented By: Steven Gilbert Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?