Doan et al v. Singh et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Doan and Pauline Doan
Defendant: Chandi Brothers, LLC, Ranjeet Singh, Prabhjot Singh, AASRA Petroleum Inc, Nirmal Singh, Nachhattar S. Chandi, KS Chandi & Sons, Inc., Gurdev Singh Teer, JPH LLC, Paul Raj Chadha, Susana E. Chandi, Jaswinder Kaur, Watsonville Petroleum, Inc and Chadha Construction
Case Number: 1:2013cv00531
Filed: April 13, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER for Expungement of Notice of Pendency of Action, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/12/14. (Hellings, J)
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS 51 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on August 6, 2014. Motion Hearing currently set for 8/13/2014 is VACATED. (Munoz, I)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER DISMISSING 36 Request for Attorney Fees signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/17/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/26/2013 re 37 Motion for Reconsideration. (Lundstrom, T)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Motions to Strike (Docs. 25 , 27 ) signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/29/2013. Motion to Dismiss first amended complaint is granted with prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/20/2013 on Motions to Dismiss and Motions to Strike re 10 , 11 . (Filing Deadline set for 7/15/2013 for Plaintiff to file and serve either papers to dismiss this action or an amended complaint).(Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doan et al v. Singh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chandi Brothers, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Corin Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ranjeet Singh
Represented By: Matthew Corin Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prabhjot Singh
Represented By: Matthew Corin Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AASRA Petroleum Inc
Represented By: Matthew Corin Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nirmal Singh
Represented By: Matthew Corin Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nachhattar S. Chandi
Represented By: Paul M. Stoddard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KS Chandi & Sons, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Corin Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gurdev Singh Teer
Represented By: Matthew Corin Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPH LLC
Represented By: Matthew Corin Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Raj Chadha
Represented By: Matthew Corin Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susana E. Chandi
Represented By: Paul M. Stoddard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaswinder Kaur
Represented By: Matthew Corin Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watsonville Petroleum, Inc
Represented By: Matthew Corin Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chadha Construction
Represented By: Matthew Corin Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Doan
Represented By: Lee H Durst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pauline Doan
Represented By: Lee H Durst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?