Paul Weldon v. Dyer et al
Plaintiff: Paul Weldon
Defendant: Jerry Dyer, John Conlee and Economy Towing
Case Number: 1:2013cv00540
Filed: April 15, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: El Dorado
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1986 Neglect of Duty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER DENYING 169 Request for Refund of Filing Fee signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/13/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER Denying 156 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/28/15. (Gonzalez, R)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER Vacating All Matters and Dates, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/24/15. (Gonzalez, R)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER Granting 96 , 97 Defendants' and Denying 139 Plaintiff's Motions for Summary Judgment and Dismissing as Moot Plaintiff's Motions to Stay and for Reconsideration, re 132 , 133 , 135 , 138 , 139 , 141 , 143 , 145 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/21/15. (Gonzalez, R)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 138 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the action be DISMISSED, with prejudice. re 77 Amended Complaint filed by Paul Weldon. referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R are due in 21 days from the service of this recommendation, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/9/2015. (Kusamura, W)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER Disregarding Plaintiff's Improperly Noticed Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/26/2015. (Hernandez, M)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER Disregarding Motion to Stay Discovery for Failure to Comply with Local Rule 230 re 117 , 118 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/24/15. (Gonzalez, R)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Motion for Mental Examination and DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order; ORDER for Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE why Sanctions Should Not be Imposed for Failure to Particiapte in Joint Statement by APRIL 3, 2015, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/20/2015. (Kusamura, W)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER GRANTING 94 Motion for Nunc Pro Tunc Order, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 03/18/2015. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER CONTINUING Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Submit to Independent Medical Examination, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/6/2015. (Marrujo, C)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Order disregarding Plaintiff's January 26, 2015 filings 89 90 [ 91], signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/28/2015. (Figueroa, O)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER ADOPTING Findings and Recommendations 86 and DENYING 79 Motion to Strike, Signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/3/2014. (Arellano, S.)
October 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Defendant's 79 Motion to Strike be Denied, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/23/14. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections Due within Thirty Days. Hearing Scheduled for 10/29/14 at 10:00 a.m. is Vacated. (Gonzalez, R)
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER DENYING 83 Motion for Protective Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/10/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER REFERRING Pending 79 Motion to Strike to Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/22/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 68 69 Motion to Amend signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/30/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Adopting 54 Findings and Recommendations, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 07/09/14. (Gonzalez, R)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Setting Further Scheduling Conference (Doc. 62 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/23/2014. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all parties shall appear for a further scheduling conference on July 9, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. All parties shall come prepared to discuss appropriate modifications to the scheduling order. (Fahrney, E)
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASE, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 06/12/14. LEAD CASE. Consolidated with 1:14-cv-00549-LJO-SAB. (Gonzalez, R)
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions should not be Imposed for Failing to Appear at Hearing signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/4/2014. Show Cause Response due by 7/2/2014. Show Cause Hearing set for 7/9/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Sant Agata, S)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting Motion To Amend Complaint To Substitute Doe Defendants (ECF No. 35 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/19/2014. (Fahrney, E)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Denying Motions for Entry of Default 30 , 31 , 32 , 33 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/4/14. (Gonzalez, R)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/11/13. Discovery Deadlines - Initial Disclosures: January 10, 2014, Non-Expert Discovery: August 27, 2014, Expert Disclosure: July 30, 2014, Supp Expert Disclosure: August 27, 20 14, Expert Discovery: September 10, 2014. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines - Filing: August 27, 2014, Hearing: Pursuant to Local Rules. Dispositive Motion Deadlines - Filing: September 10, 2014, Hearing: Pursuant to Local Rules. Pretrial Conference set for 12/3/2014 at 08:15 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Jury Trial set for 1/13/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Verduzco, M)
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER RESCHEDULING Initial Scheduling Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/11/2013. Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/10/2013 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Sant Agata, S)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Directing Issuance of Summons and New Case Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 7/9/13. (Gonzalez, R)
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of Certain Claims re 10 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 6/26/13. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Denying Motion To Amend Party Name (ECF No. 8 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 5/24/2013. (Fahrney, E)
May 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH LEAVE TO AMEND, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 05/21/2013. (30) DAY DEADLINE(Martin-Gill, S)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Denying as Moot 3 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 5/15/13. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paul Weldon v. Dyer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Weldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Dyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Conlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Economy Towing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?