Pride Packing, CO. v. MAF Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: Pride Packing, CO.
Defendant: MAF Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00573
Filed: April 18, 2013
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S 71 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/7/2016. CASE CLOSED. (Lundstrom, T)
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER DIRECTING TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE: POTENTIAL FOR SETTLEMENT OF ISSUES OF LAW; Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/31/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/25/2016. (Kusamura, W)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER DIRECTING SUBMISSION OF LEGIBLE EXHIBIT, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/17/2016. (Kusamura, W)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue the Pretrial Conference currently set for 1/6/2016 to 1/28/2016 at 10:00 AM and to continue the Jury Trial currently set for 3/1/2016 to 4/26/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/23/2015. (Kusamura, W)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Modifying Scheduling Conference Order and Continuing Trial re 24 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/24/2015. Deadlines and dates extended as follows: Expert Disclosure due by 7/31/2015; Supplemental Expert Disclosure due by 8/ 28/2015; Expert Discovery due by 9/30/2015; Non-Dispositive Motions filed by 10/15/2015; Dispositive Motions filed by 10/15/2015; Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Jury Trial set for 3/1/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Martinez, A)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION to Modify Scheduling Conference Order and Continue Trial; ORDER Thereon signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/3/2014. New Deadlines and Dates as follows: Non-Expert Discovery due by 9/29/2014; Expert Disclosure due by 10/30/2 014; Supplemental Expert Disclosure due by 11/13/2014; Expert Discovery due by 1/2/2015; Nondispositive Motions filed by 1/8/2015; Dispositive Motions filed by 2/5/2015; Pretrial Conference set for 4/30/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Jury Trial set for 6/30/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Martinez, A)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re 19 Stipulation to Modify Scheduling Conference Order and Continue Trial signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/31/2014. Deadlines and Dates extended as follows: Nonexpert Discovery due by 7/1/2014; Expert Disclosure due by 8/1/ 2014; Supplemental Expert Disclosure due by 8/15/2014; Expert Discovery due by 10/3/2014; Non-Dispositive Motions filed by 10/10/2014; Dispositive Motions filed by 11/4/2014; Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Jury Trial set for 4/7/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii.(Martinez, A)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 8 Notice of Errata Regarding Exhibit "A" to Plaintiff's Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/10/2013. (Martinez, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pride Packing, CO. v. MAF Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAF Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pride Packing, CO.
Represented By: Dayna Christine Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?