Berman v. Reynolds et al
Plaintiff: Richard P. Berman
Defendant: John Reynolds, Margaret Mims, Tracy Sink, George Bertsch, County of Fresno and The Judicial Council of California
Case Number: 1:2013cv00597
Filed: April 23, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER on Stipulation to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/21/16. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER VACATING PENDING DATES AND REQUIRING PARTIES TO FILE DISPOSITIONAL DOCUMENTS WITHIN NINETY DAYS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/31/2016. (Hernandez, M)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER RE MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/27/2016. (Hernandez, M)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER VACATING May 27, 2016 Hearing on Motion to Dismiss and GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice Judicial Council of California 82 , 84 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/16/16. (Hellings, J)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND REQUIRING DEFENDANTS SINK AND COUNTY OF FRESNO TO FILE OPPOSITION OR STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA FROM THIS ACTION BY MAY 13, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/11/2016. (Hernandez, M)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY DEFENDANT JUDICIAL COUNSEL OF CALIFORNIA SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FROM THIS ACTION FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH FEDERAL RULE OF FEDERAL PROCEDURE. FIVE DAY DEADLINE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/9/2016. (Hernandez, M)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER RE STIPULATIONS RE TRIAL EVIDENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/6/2016. (Hernandez, M)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 67 Defendant Fresno County's Motion for Summary Judgment as to the Fifth Claim Regarding 4th Amendment Violations Only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/2/2016. (Hernandez, M)
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO EXCEED THE PAGE LIMITATIONS FOR OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/7/2016. (Hernandez, M)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Stipulation and Order to Amend Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/22/2016. (Non Medical Expert Discovery Deadline: 3/25/2016; Medcial Expert Discovery due by 5/6/2016; Dispositive Motions filed by 2/29/2016; Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2016 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone) **TIME CHANGE ONLY AS TO THE PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE** (Rosales, O)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/12/2016. (Hernandez, M)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER TO AMEND DISPOSITIVE MOTION FILING DEADLINE FROM JANUARY 25, 2016 TO FEBRUARY 22, 2016. All other dates in the Scheduling Order shall remain as set. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/22/2016. (Hernandez, M)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Re Stipulation to Continue Trial Date and Amend Scheduling Order as follows: Expert Discovery Deadline 2/26/2016; Non Dispositive Motion Deadline 1/13/2016; Dispositive Motion Deadline 1/25/2016; Pretrial Conference 4/8/2016 at 9:30 am before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone; Trial set for 6/6/2016 at 9:00 am before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/29/2015. (Hernandez, M)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER. Dispositive motions shall be filed on or before 9/30/2015; All expert discovery shall be completed on or before 10/30/2015; and the Court's March 6, 2015 amended scheduling order shall remain in effect in all other respects. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/8/2015. (Hernandez, M)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION and ORDER TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER - Last Day to Disclose Experts 3/16/2015; Last Day to Disclose Supplemental Experts 3/23/2015. All other scheduling order dates will remain the same. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/3/2015. (Hernandez, M)
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION and ORDER for Rule 35 Physical Examination, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/27/2015. (Kusamura, W)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DENYING 35 MOTION FOR PHYSICAL EXAMINATION WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The hearing set for 1/28/2015 is taken off calendar and the parties shall not appear at that time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/22/2015. (Hernandez, M)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER MODIFYING the Scheduling Order as follows: Non-Expert Discovery deadline extended from 2/13/2015 to 4/3/2015. All other dates remain as set in the 7/1/2014 Scheduling Order. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/23/2014. (Rooney, M)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/14/2014. (Hernandez, M)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SECOND PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/26/2014. (Hernandez, M)
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 AMENDED STIPULATION and ORDER TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/11/2014. (Hernandez, M)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER - Pretrial Conference set for 7/1/2015 at 08:15 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Jury Trial set for 8/18/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/1/2014. (Hernandez, M)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER re coordination of expert designation and non expert discovery completion dates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/19/2014. (Hernandez, M)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/18/2014. (Hernandez, M)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER on County Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/28/13. John Reynolds, George Bertsch and Margaret Mims terminated. Answer Deadline: 6/7/2013. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berman v. Reynolds et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Reynolds
Represented By: Michael Robert Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Mims
Represented By: Michael Robert Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Sink
Represented By: Michael Robert Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Bertsch
Represented By: Michael Robert Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Fresno
Represented By: Michael Robert Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Judicial Council of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard P. Berman
Represented By: Kevin Gerard Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?