Garcia v. Biter et al
Plaintiff: Felipe Garcia
Defendant: M. Biter, Kim Holland, R. Hernandez, Baker, Mosqueda, Emerson, Rodriguez and Hudspeth
Case Number: 1:2013cv00599
Filed: April 25, 2013
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 98 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/30/16. (Verduzco, M)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment be GRANTED and Plaintiff's case be DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to exhaust this administrative remedies re 60 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT ; referred to Judge O'Neill,signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/16/2016. Objections to F&R due (21-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration and DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Second Opposition/Surreply to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (re docs 87 & 88 ), signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/15/16. (Marrujo, C)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER on Plaintiff's 82 Motion for Status, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/9/16. (Verduzco, M)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Denying 79 Motion for Appointment of Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/6/16. (Verduzco, M)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Striking Duplicative Opposition, Denying Motion To Strike As Moot, Granting Motion For Protective Order, And Staying Discovery Pending Resolution Of Motion For Summary Judgment For Failure To Exhaust (Docs. 62 , 69 , and 71 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/16/2015. (Fahrney, E)
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER DENYING 64 Motion, With Prejudice, for Lack of Jurisdiction signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/27/2015. (Jessen, A)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER DISREGARDING Reply to Answer 52 and 53 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/13/15. (Hellings, J)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER DENYING with prejudice Plaintiff's Pitchess 58 Motion, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/28/2015. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER DENYING 56 Request for Clerk of Court to Issue Subpoena Duces Tecum signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/17/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER striking 49 Declaration filed by Felipe Garcia signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/29/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Adopting Findings and Recommendations, Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus, and Denying Motion for Injunctive Relief RE 34 , 35 , 39 , 40 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/27/15. (Gonzalez, R)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk's Office to Change Plaintiff's Address and Send Docket Copy, DENYING Motion for Service as MOOT and ORDER DENYING 36 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 04/28/2015. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Adopting 28 Findings and Recommendations, Dismissing Certain Claims and Parties, and Referring Matter Back to Magistrate Judge for Service of Process, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/9/15. (Verduzco, M)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER addressing 27 Motion for Case Status signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/18/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Denying 18 Motion for Preliminary Injunction for Lack of Jurisdiction signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 04/24/2014. (Flores, E)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER (1) Severing Plaintiff's Claims Arising From Events At California Correctional Institution From Claims Arising From Events At Kern Valley State Prison And (2) Referring Matter Back To Magistrate Judge To Screen Remaining Claims (Doc. 15 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/11/2014. (Fahrney, E)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING Motion to File Amended Complaint as Moot and GRANTING Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint 8 , 10 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/10/14: The Clerk of the Court shall file Plaintiff's second amended complaint lodged on October 18, 2013. (Hellings, J)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus 12 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/10/14. (Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Biter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felipe Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Biter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mosqueda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudspeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?