Gutierrez v. Vantia Properties, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Natividad Gutierrez
Defendant: Vantia Properties, LLC, Juan Vazquez and Nicolas Vazquez
Case Number: 1:2013cv00642
Filed: May 2, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER for APPEARANCE and EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR VANTIA PROPERTIES. Defendant/judgment debtor Vantia Properties, LLC, shall designate one or more officers, directors, or managing agents who are familiar with Vantia Properties, LLC's prop erty and debts and shall appear personally on Wednesday, March 18, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 7 of the United States District Courthouse, located at 2500 Tulare Street, Fresno, California, 93721, to furnish information to aid in enforcement of a money judgment by answering questions about the Defendant/judgment debtor's real and person property; Plaintiff/judgment creditor must serve this order upon Defendant/judgment debtor Vantia Properties, LLC, personally not less than 10 days be fore the date set for the examination and must file a certificate of such service with the Court; and if Plaintiff/judgment creditor is unable to effectuate personal service on Defendant/judgment debtor Vantia Properties, LLC, within the required ti me, Plaintiff/judgment creditor must file notice with the Court by no later than 9 days before the date set for the examination and inform the Court that the examination hearing must be taken off calendar. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/12/2015. (Timken, A)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DENYING Without Prejudice 47 Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce Judgment. The hearing on said motion set for 1/14/2015, is VACATED. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/13/2015. (Timken, A)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/20/2014 recommending that 40 MOTION for DEFAULT JUDGMENT be granted. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 6/13/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of Defendants: Juan Vazquez, aka Juan Omar Rosales Gutierrez, DBA Taqueria San Juan, and Nicolas Vazquez, aka Nicolas Gonzalez Sr., DBA Taqueria San Juan ONLY; ORDER, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 03/07/2014. Juan Vazquez and Nicolas Vazquez terminated. (Martin-Gill, S)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER AFTER SETTLEMENT signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/18/2014. Filing Deadline: 3/24/2014. (Jessen, A)
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER SETTING Settlement Conference. A Settlement Conference is SET for 2/13/2014, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. By no later than 2/6/2014, the parties shall submit a confidential settlement conference statement to the Court via email at skoorders@caed.uscourts.gov (but not filed on the docket) that includes the information set forth in this order. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/3/2014. (Timken, A)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Allowing Additional Time for Defendants Juan and Nicolas Vazquez to File a Motion to Set Aside Their Entries of Default. The hearing on Plaintiff's motion for default judgment is held in abeyance to allow the Vazquez Defendants an opport unity to file a motion to set aside the entries of default against them; the Vazquez Defendants shall have until January 30, 2014, to file a motion to set aside their entries of default; any opposition to the motion to set aside the entries of defa ult shall be filed by Plaintiff no later than February 21, 2014; a hearing on the Vazquez Defendants' motion to set aside their entries of default is set for Wednesday, March 5, 2014, at 10:00 a.m.; and if the Vazquez Defendants fail to file a motion to set aside their entries of default by January 30, 2014, the Court will consider Plaintiff's motion for default judgment submitted for decision. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/21/2013. (Timken, A)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's request to appear telephonically at hearing. Plaintiff may appear telephonically at the November 21, 2013, hearing on the motion for default judgment. Plaintiff's counsel is to call chambers five (5) minutes prior to the scheduling hearing time. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/19/2013. (Timken, A)
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER CONTINUING the hearing on Plaintiff's motion for default judgment. The hearing on Plaintiff's motion for default judgment is CONTINUED to November 21, 2013, at 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom 7 before U.S. Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto; and the parties shall inform the Court by no later than November 18, 2013, whether the claims against the Vazquez Defendants have been resolved. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/6/2013. (Timken, A)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING Request for Continuance of Motion for Default Judgment Hearing, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/19/2013. Motion Hearing RESET for 11/6/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gutierrez v. Vantia Properties, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natividad Gutierrez
Represented By: Tanya E. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vantia Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Vazquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicolas Vazquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?