Carey v. Alphonso et al
Plaintiff: Nathan Charles Carey
Defendant: A. Alphonso, Marquez, Ponder, Ascevito and Southerland
Case Number: 1:2013cv00669
Filed: May 8, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Granting Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 29 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/5/16. This Case is Assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone, New Case Number is: 1:13-cv-00669-DAD-SAB. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's 27 Motion to Modify Discovery and Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 04/8/15. (Motion for Summary Judgment due 05/25/2015) (Martin-Gill, S)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's 24 Request to Modify the Discovery and Scheduling Order to Conduct Plaintiff's Deposition signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/23/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 22 Motion for Appointment of Counsel, without Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/5/14. (Gonzalez, R)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DENYING 19 Motion for Clarification, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/25/14. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER STRIKING 15 Reply to Answer, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/4/14. (Martin-Gill, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carey v. Alphonso et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Charles Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Alphonso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ponder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascevito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southerland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?