Martin v. Fernandez et al
Plaintiff: Brian Martin
Defendant: Mark Geston, Jennifer Jones, Maureen Briggs, John Amaya and Anthony Fernandez
Case Number: 1:2013cv00754
Filed: May 21, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION For Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice (Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii)) ORDER, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/24/2014. CASE CLOSED.(Fahrney, E)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 AMENDED ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Brian Douglas Martin, CDC# T-94632, Plaintiff, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/24/2014. Settlement Conference set for 6/13/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Marrujo, C)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER & WRIT Of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum To Transport Brian Douglas Martin, CDC# T-94632, Plaintiff, Date: June 11, 2014, Time: 9:30 a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/24/2014. (Fahrney, E)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER denying 39 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/15/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Reconsideration Of Order Denying Appointment Of Counsel (Doc. 33 ), signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/4/2014. (Fahrney, E)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Denying Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (Doc. 30 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/5/2013. (Fahrney, E)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER CONSTRUING 19 MOTION REQUESTING COURT ORDER FORCING PRISON OFFICIALS TO ALLOW PLAINTIFF PHYSICAL ACCESS TO THE LAW LIBRARY AS A MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; AND DENYING 19 PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/19/2013. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Fernandez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Geston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maureen Briggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Amaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?