Carter v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Styauno Carter
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2013cv00782
Filed: May 24, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DIRECTING Entry of Judgment in Favor of Defendant Carolyn Colvin, Acting Commissioner of Social Security and Against Plaintiff signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/16/2014. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING Extension of Time re 15 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/24/2014. (Hall, S)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting Motion To Proceed Informa Pauperis (Docs. 2 , 4 ), ORDER Directing Clerk To Issue Summons And Social Security Case Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/1/2013. (Fahrney, E)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to File an Amended Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis 2 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/28/2013. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Styauno Carter
Represented By: Roger David Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?