Garcia v. County of Fresno
Plaintiff: Rex Garcia
Defendant: County of Fresno
Case Number: 1:2013cv00783
Filed: May 24, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE, WAIVER OF RIGHTS OF APPEAL AND ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSING ACTION signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/1/2016. CASE CLOSED. (Lundstrom, T)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER (Plaintiffs Motion for Definite Statement Doc. 35), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/4/2015. (Herman, H)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION and ORDER Continuing Hearing on Motion to Determine the Preclusive Effect of Judge Wanger's Memorandum Decision re: Motions for Summary Judgment: Motion Hearing (Doc. 35) is continued from 4/10/2015 to May 1, 2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/6/2015. (Herman, H)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Stipulation and Order continuing telephonic status conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/9/2014. Telephonic Status Conference currently set for 12/10/2014 has been CONTINUED to 12/17/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Figueroa, O)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Regarding Settlement Conference Procedures signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/3/2014. (Martinez, A)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER to Relate Actions, to Reassign Judges and to File Consent Forms, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/13/13. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. County of Fresno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rex Garcia
Represented By: James W Henderson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Fresno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?