Crisp v. Wasco State Prison et al
Plaintiff: Obie Crisp
Defendant: Mouseff and Wasco State Prison
Case Number: 1:2013cv00815
Filed: May 31, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Appeal To District Court Judge (ECF No. 34 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/14/2015. (Fahrney, E)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION re 31 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/10/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 29 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/02/2014. (Flores, E)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DENYING 27 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/12/2014. (Jessen, A)
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION for Failure to State a Claim signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/06/2014. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying 16 Motion for discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/13/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 6 Request to File Late Government Claim signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 03/11/2014. (Flores, E)
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 10 Motion for Leave to Amend as Unnecessary signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 08/12/2013. (Flores, E)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 7 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/23/2013. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crisp v. Wasco State Prison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mouseff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wasco State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Obie Crisp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?