Luna v. Cate, et al.
Plaintiff: William Luna
Defendant: Matthew Cate, Secretary of the CDCR and R. S. Lambert
Case Number: 1:2013cv00822
Filed: May 30, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER DISMISSING Action without Prejudice and CLOSING CASE signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/4/2016. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER DIRECTING Defendants to File an Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/26/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Denying 56 Motion to Compel, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/4/16. (Verduzco, M)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER DENYING 54 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/23/2015. (Jessen, A)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER DENYING 48 Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default as to Defendant Wallace as Premature signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/14/2015. (Jessen, A)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Motion Relating to Filing of Second and/or Third Amended Complaint 29 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/21/14: Motion is DENIED. (Hellings, J)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Striking 8 Plaintiff's Unsigned Motion, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 7/25/13. (Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luna v. Cate, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of the CDCR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. S. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?