Primerica Life Insurance Company v. Carrington et al
Plaintiff: Primerica Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Lisa Carrington, Laura Santos, Cheri Lueck and Donald Atkins
Case Number: 1:2013cv00825
Filed: May 29, 2013
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER DISMISSING Defendant Donald L. Atkins and Closing Case in Light of Request for Dismissal signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/01/2015. CASE CLOSED. (Flores, E)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Dismissing Action with Prjudice as to Lisa Carrington, Laura Santos, and Cheri Lueck Only, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/19/15. (Verduzco, M)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Pretrial Conference, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/23/2015. (Pretrial Conference previously set for 1/28/2015, has been CONTINUED to 2/20/2015, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii.)(Gaumnitz, R)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER RE: Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order Regarding Non-Disclosure of Confidential Information, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 04/08/2014. (Yu, L)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order Staying Matter With Regard To Defendant Donald Atkins Only, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 03/13/2014. (Yu, L)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER The Initial Scheduling Conference set for September 12, 2013 is CONTINUED to November 14, 2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 08/28/2013. (Yu, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Primerica Life Insurance Company v. Carrington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Carrington
Represented By: Paul J. O'Rourke, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheri Lueck
Represented By: Paul J. O'Rourke, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Atkins
Represented By: Paul J. O'Rourke, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Primerica Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Ophir Johna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?