J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Ferrero
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Jose Antonio Ferrero
Case Number: 1:2013cv00856
Filed: June 4, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:553 Unauthorized Reception of Cable Service
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER RE: Defendant's Counsel's Motions to Withdraw as Attorney of Record re 29 and 30 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/17/2014. (Martinez, A)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Stipulation of Dismissal of Plaintiff's Complaint Against Defendant Jose Antonio Ferrero; ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/27/14. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Stipulation of DISMISSAL of Plaintiff's Complaint Against Defendant Jose Antonio Ferrero, Individually and d/b/a/ Nicks Lounge, ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/1/2013. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER after Settlement signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 09/18/2013. Notice to Dismiss: 10/18/2013. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Ferrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Antonio Ferrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?