Slagel v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Leilani Loren Slagel
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2013cv00857
Filed: June 4, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR THE AWARD AND PAYMENT OF ATTORNEY FEES AND EXPENSES PURSUANT TO THE EQUAL ACCESS TO JUSTICE ACT, 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d) AND COSTS PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1920, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/16/2016. (Kusamura, W)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER on Stipulation for REMAND signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/27/2016. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Plaintiff's confidential letter brief shall be served on or before May 23, 2016. All other dates in the scheduling order are extending accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/20/2016. (Hernandez, M)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER For Remand, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/1/2013. REMANDING CASE to Commissioner of Social Security. Copy of remand order sent to other court. CASE CLOSED. (Fahrney, E)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING 10 Motion to Stay, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/1/2013. (Figueroa, O)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slagel v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leilani Loren Slagel
Represented By: Young Chul Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Annabelle J. Yang, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?