PSC Industrial Outsourcing, LP v. Kodysz
Plaintiff: PSC Industrial Outsourcing, LP
Defendant: Kenneth Kodysz
Case Number: 1:2013cv00964
Filed: June 24, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Dissolving TRO and Dismissing Action with Prejudice signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 05/28/2014. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING Leave to File First Amended Answer 27 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/12/2014. (Hall, S)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Conference re 19 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/2/2013. Initial Scheduling Conference CONTINUED to 11/7/2013 at 09:30 AM at the United States Courthouse, 510 19th Street (JLT), Bakersfield, before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Appearances via CourtCall are authorized. Joint Scheduling Report filing deadline 10/31/2013. (Hall, S)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 17 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/14/2013. (Hall, S)
July 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re: Plaintiff PSC Industrial Outsourcing, LP's Request to Seal Documents, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/3/2013. (Marrujo, C)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER on Plaintiff's Ex Parte application for Temporary Restraqining Order and order to show cause re: Preliminary Injunction. signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/3/13. (Nazaroff, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PSC Industrial Outsourcing, LP v. Kodysz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PSC Industrial Outsourcing, LP
Represented By: Spencer H Hipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Kodysz
Represented By: David E. Finck, PHV
Represented By: Heather A. Kabele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?