James v. Granger
Plaintiff: Scott R. James
Defendant: Kimberly Granger and Steve Lindley
Case Number: 1:2013cv00983
Filed: June 26, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Referring Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION and ORDER for Waiver of Costs in Exchange for Waiver of Right to Appeal. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/1/2016. (Timken, A)
January 28, 2016 Filing 86 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Waiver of Costs in Exchange for Waiver of Right to Appeal by Scott R. James. (Herr, Leonard)
January 11, 2016 Filing 85 BILL of COSTS SUBMITTED Amended by Kimberly Granger, Steve Lindley. (Woodbridge Guess, Catherine)
January 8, 2016 Filing 84 CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney Catherine Woodridge Guess; The Court acknowledges the receipt of the Bill of Costs. However per Local Rule 292(b) you must attach an itemization of the costs to support your declaration. An Amended Bill of Costs must be filed within the 14 day filing deadline for Bills of Cost. (Kusamura, W)
January 7, 2016 Filing 83 BILL of COSTS SUBMITTED by Kimberly Granger, Steve Lindley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Catherine W. Guess in Support of Bill of Costs, #2 Proof of Service)(Woodbridge Guess, Catherine)
December 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 82 JUDGMENT dated *12/31/2015* pursuant to order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/31/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
December 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MEMORANDUM, OPINION and ORDER granting #73 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/31/2015. CASE CLOSED.(Lundstrom, T)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION and ORDER CANCELLING Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for December 10, 2015. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/9/2015. (Timken, A)
December 8, 2015 Filing 79 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Cancelling Mid-Discovery Status Conference by Scott R. James. (Herr, Leonard)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** Plaintiff has submitted a mid-discovery status report regarding the mid-discovery status conference set for December 10, 2015. The status report does not indicate any disputed issue. If the parties determine there is no need for a mid-discovery status conference, they may file a stipulation to vacate the conference. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/3/2015. (Timken, A)
December 3, 2015 Filing 77 STATUS REPORT by Scott R. James. (Herr, Leonard)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MINUTE ORDER: (Text Entry Only) The hearing set 12/7/2015 on the pending #73 Motion for Summary Judgment is ORDERED VACATED; the matter is submitted for decision on the papers pursuant to Local Rule 230(g). Minute Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/2/2015. (Gaumnitz, R)
November 30, 2015 Filing 75 REPLY by Kimberly Granger, Steve Lindley re #74 Opposition to Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Objections to Plaintiff's Undisputed Facts in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Woodbridge Guess, Catherine)
November 23, 2015 Filing 74 OPPOSITION by Scott R. James to #73 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: #1 Response to Defendant's Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts, #2 Plaintiff's Separate Statement of Facts in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Declaration of Leonard C. Herr in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)(Herr, Leonard)
November 4, 2015 Filing 73 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Kimberly Granger, Steve Lindley. Motion Hearing set for 12/7/2015 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #2 Declaration of Catherine Guess, #3 Request for Judicial Notice)(Woodbridge Guess, Catherine)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION and AMENDED ORDER re EXTENSION OF TIME TO DESIGNATE RULE 26 EXPERTS. Discovery deadlines and motion filing deadlines are continued as follows: Expert Disclosure: October 16, 2015. Supplemental Expert Disclosure: November 2, 2015. Expert Discovery cutoff: December 9, 2015. Non Dispositive Motions: Filing: December 31, 2015; Hearing: February 3, 2016. Dispositive Motions: Filing: December 31, 2015; Hearing: February 8, 2016. Pre-Trial Conference: March 23, 2016, at 10:00 a.m., Ctrm 2. Trial: May 17, 2016, at 8:30 a.m., in Ctrm 2. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/8/2015. (Timken, A)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION and ORDER re EXTENSION OF TIME TO DESIGNATE RULE 26 EXPERTS. Discovery deadlines and motion filing deadlines are continued as follows: Expert Disclosure: October 9, 2015. Supplemental Expert Disclosure: October 26, 2015. Expert Discovery cutoff: December 9, 2015. Non Dispositive Motions: Filing: December 31, 2015; Hearing: February 3, 2016. Dispositive Motions: Filing: December 31, 2015; Hearing: February 8, 2016. Pre-Trial Conference: March 23, 2016, at 10:00 a.m., Ctrm 2; Trial: May 17, 2016, at 8:30 a.m., in Ctrm 2. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/8/2015. (Timken, A)
October 6, 2015 Filing 70 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Designate Rule 26 Experts by Scott R. James. (Herr, Leonard)
September 10, 2015 Filing 69 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held on 9/10/2015; Leonard Herr for plaintiff and Catherine Woodbridge Guess for defendant, personally appeared. CASE NOT SETTLED. (Yu, L)
September 10, 2015 Filing 68 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held on 9/10/2015; CASE NOT SETTLED. Plaintiffs Counsel L. Herr present. Defendants Counsel C. Guess & R. Wilson present. (Kusamura, W)
September 8, 2015 Filing 67 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Kimberly Granger, Steve Lindley.(Woodbridge Guess, Catherine)
September 3, 2015 Filing 66 NOTICE OF LODGING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT by Scott R. James. (Herr, Leonard)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MINUTE ORDER: (***TEXT ONLY***)The Settlement Conference set for September 11, 2015 at 11:00 AM is ADVANCED to September 10, 2015 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng. Each party must submit a Settlement Conference Statement to Judge Seng's Yosemite chambers at least one week prior to the Settlement Conference. Electronic versions may be emailed to mjsorders@caed.uscourts.gov. Each party's Settlement Conference Statement should be brief but as lengthy as the party deems necessary to provide the information requested by the Court. However, any Settlement Conference Statement that exceeds six (6) double-spaced pages, MUST be accompanied by a summary or outline of same not to exceed three (3) double-spaced pages,signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 08/17/2015. (Yu, L)
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTE ORDER: (***TEXT ONLY***) The Settlement Conference set for August 21, 2015 at 10:00 AM is CONTINUED to September 11, 2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng. Each party must submit a Settlement Conference Statement to Judge Sengs Yosemite chambers at least one week prior to the Settlement Conference. Electronic versions may be emailed to mjsorders@caed.uscourts.gov. Each party's Settlement Conference Statement should be brief but as lengthy as the party deems necessary to provide the information requested by the Court. However, any Settlement Conference Statement that exceeds six (6) double-spaced pages, MUST be accompanied by a summary or outline of same not to exceed three (3) double-spaced pages,, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 08/13/2015. (Yu, L)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER on Defendant's #53 Motion to Dismiss & #59 Motion for Sanctions, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/6/2015. (Kusamura, W)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MINUTE ORDER: (Text Entry Only) The hearing set 8/3/2015 on the pending #59 Motion for Sanctions is ORDERED VACATED; the matter is submitted for decision on the papers pursuant to Local Rule 230(g). Minute Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/28/2015. (Gaumnitz, R)
July 24, 2015 Filing 61 REPLY by Kimberly Granger, Steve Lindley re #60 Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Objection to Request for Judicial Notice and to Exhibits to Statler Declaration)(Woodbridge Guess, Catherine)
July 20, 2015 Filing 60 OPPOSITION by Scott R. James to #59 MOTION for SANCTIONS . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leonard C. Herr, #2 Request for Judicial Notice)(Herr, Leonard)
July 3, 2015 Filing 59 MOTION for SANCTIONS by Kimberly Granger, Steve Lindley. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2015 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Woodbridge Guess, Catherine)
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MINUTE ORDER: (Text Entry Only) The hearing set 7/13/2015 on the pending #53 Motion to Dismiss is ORDERED VACATED; the matter is submitted for decision on the papers pursuant to Local Rule 230(g). Minute Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/2/2015. (Gaumnitz, R)
July 1, 2015 Filing 57 REPLY by Kimberly Granger, Steve Lindley re #56 Opposition to Motion. (Woodbridge Guess, Catherine)
June 29, 2015 Filing 56 OPPOSITION by Scott R. James to #53 MOTION to DISMISS. (Herr, Leonard)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MINUTE ORDER: (***TEXT ONLY***)The Settlement Conference set for August 13, 2015 at 10:00 AM is CONTINUED to August 21, 2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng. Each party must submit a Settlement Conference Statement to Judge Sengs Yosemite chambers at least one week prior to the Settlement Conference. Electronic versions may be emailed to mjsorders@caed.uscourts.gov. Each partys Settlement Conference Statement should be brief but as lengthy as the party deems necessary to provide the information requested by the Court. However, any Settlement Conference Statement that exceeds six (6) double-spaced pages, MUST be accompanied by a summary or outline of same not to exceed three (3) double-spaced pages,signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 06/23/2015. (Yu, L)
June 11, 2015 Filing 54 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Kimberly Granger, Steve Lindley in re #53 Motion to Dismiss. (Woodbridge Guess, Catherine)
June 11, 2015 Filing 53 MOTION to DISMISS by Kimberly Granger, Steve Lindley. Attorney Woodbridge Guess, Catherine A. added. Motion Hearing set for 7/13/2015 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Woodbridge Guess, Catherine)
May 29, 2015 Filing 52 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Steve Lindley* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Leonard Charles Herr* *Herr Pedersen & Berglund, LLP* *100 Willow Plaza, Suite 300* *Visalia, CA 93291*. (Flores, E)
May 28, 2015 Filing 51 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kimberly Granger by Scott R. James.(Herr, Leonard)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING plaintiff's Motion to Amend, document #43 , and DIRECTNG plaintiff to file a third amended complaint within two days of service of this order. Defendant's responsive pleading is due within the time-frame permitted by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/26/2015. (Rooney, M)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** The Court finds the Motion to Amend the Complaint #43 suitable for decision without oral argument, pursuant to Local Rule 230(g). Accordingly, the hearing set for May 27, 2015, is VACATED; the parties do not need to appear. The Court to issue order. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/22/2015. (Timken, A)
May 20, 2015 Filing 48 REPLY by Scott R. James re #45 Opposition to Motion. (Herr, Leonard)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION and ORDER MODIFYING Settlement Conference Date. The Settlement Conference currently set for 10/22/2015, is RESET for 8/13/2015, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/19/2015. (Timken, A)
May 18, 2015 Filing 46 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for MODIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE DATE by Scott R. James. (Herr, Leonard)
May 11, 2015 Filing 45 OPPOSITION by Kimberly Granger to #43 MOTION to AMEND the #22 Amended Complaint. (Woodbridge Guess, Catherine)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** The Motion to Amend #43 currently set for 6/1/2015, before Judge Ishii, has been RESET for 5/27/2015, at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/16/2015. (Timken, A)
April 15, 2015 Filing 43 MOTION to AMEND the #22 Amended Complaint by Scott R. James. Motion Hearing set for 6/1/2015 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Hearing on Motion to Amend, #2 Declaration of Ron Statler in Support of Motion to Amend, #3 Proposed Order on Motion to Amend)(Herr, Leonard)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 12/10/2015, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Settlement Conference set for 10/22/2015, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Pretrial Conference set for 3/23/2016, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Jury Trial set for 5/17/2016, at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/18/2015. (Timken, A) Modified (corrected trial date) on 3/19/2015 (Gaumnitz, R).
March 13, 2015 Filing 41 PROPOSED ORDER re Amended Scheduling Conference by Scott R. James. (Herr, Leonard)
March 11, 2015 Filing 40 PROPOSED ORDER re Amended Scheduling Conference by Scott R. James. (Herr, Leonard)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** The docket indicates that you docketed a Joint Scheduling Report, #38 , however you failed to file and provide the Court your proposed order. Please e-file and send your proposed order to Judge Oberto's order box so it can be signed. Please submit the document in Word format to skoorders@caed.uscourts.gov. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/6/2015. (Timken, A)
March 5, 2015 Filing 38 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Scott R. James. (Herr, Leonard)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER re SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/24/2015. (Timken, A)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATED Joint Request For Continuance of Trial and Related Dates and ORDER Thereon, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/19/2015. (1. Jury Trial CONTINUED to 4/26/2016, at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. 2. Discovery in this matter may continue pending the entry of a new discovery cut-off date. 3. The parties shall meet and confer, and thereafter submit a joint scheduling report to the Court within two calendar weeks of the Courts entry of this stipulated order for the determination of new dates, including discovery and motion practice deadlines. 4. The parties shall submit to the Courts entry of the joint scheduling report as its order or will otherwise attend a further joint scheduling conference as directed by the Court after submission of that report.)(Gaumnitz, R)
February 18, 2015 Filing 35 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance of Trial and Related Dates by Scott R. James. (Herr, Leonard)
December 30, 2014 Filing 34 NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE by Scott R. James. (Herr, Leonard)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SCHEDULING ORDER : Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures: July 22, 2014; Non Expert Discovery: March 9, 2015; Expert Disclosure: April 9, 2015; Supplemental Expert Disclosure: April 24, 2015; Expert Discovery: June 9, 2015. Mid-Discovery Status Deadlines: Filing: June 3, 2015; Conference set for 6/10/2015, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Non-Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 4/1/2015. Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 6/1/2015. Settlement Conference set for 4/9/2015, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Pretrial Conference set for 8/19/2015, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Jury Trial (5 days) set for 10/20/2015, at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/26/2014. (Timken, A)
June 24, 2014 Filing 32 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto: TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 6/24/2014, in chambers and off the record. The Court to issue written order. Plaintiff's Counsel Leonard Herr, telephonically present. Defendant's Counsel Catherine Woodbridge Guess, telephonically present. Court Reporter/CD Number: In Chambers. (Timken, A)
June 17, 2014 Filing 31 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Scott R. James. (Herr, Leonard)
June 2, 2014 Filing 30 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Kimberly Granger.(Woodbridge Guess, Catherine)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER ; denying #23 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/28/14. (Nazaroff, H)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER vacating hearing date of April 21, 2014 and taking matter under submission signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/16/14. (Nazaroff, H)
April 11, 2014 Filing 27 REPLY by Kimberly Granger re #23 MOTION to DISMISS. (Woodbridge Guess, Catherine)
April 7, 2014 Filing 26 OPPOSITION by Scott R. James to #23 MOTION to DISMISS. (Herr, Leonard)
April 1, 2014 Filing 25 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Kimberly Granger in re #23 Motion to Dismiss. (Woodbridge Guess, Catherine)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** Motion to Dismiss #23 pending before the court, the Scheduling Conference currently set for 4/1/2014, is CONTINUED to 6/24/2014, at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties' joint scheduling report shall be filed by no later than 6/17/2014. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/25/2014. (Timken, A)
March 20, 2014 Filing 23 MOTION to DISMISS by Kimberly Granger. Motion Hearing set for 4/21/2014 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice)(Woodbridge Guess, Catherine)
March 13, 2014 Filing 22 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kimberly Granger by Scott R. James.(Herr, Leonard)
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** Order #20 allows Plaintiff 28 days to file an amended complaint, therefore, the Scheduling Conference currently set for 3/6/2014, is CONTINUED to 4/1/2014, at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/3/2014. (Timken, A)
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Doc. #12 ), Signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/12/2014. (Arellano, S.)
December 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** Motion to Dismiss #12 pending before the court, the Scheduling Conference currently set for 1/7/2014, is CONTINUED to 3/6/2014, at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/26/2013. (Timken, A)
December 17, 2013 Filing 18 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Scott R. James. (Herr, Leonard)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** Motion to Dismiss #12 currently pending before the court, the Scheduling Conference currently set for 11/19/2013, is CONTINUED to 1/7/2014, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/1/2013. (Timken, A)
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER vacating hearing date of 10/28/13 and taking matter under submission. signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/24/13. (Nazaroff, H)
October 21, 2013 Filing 15 REPLY by Kimberly Granger re #12 MOTION to DISMISS. (Woodbridge Guess, Catherine)
October 15, 2013 Filing 14 OPPOSITION by Scott R. James to #12 MOTION to DISMISS. (Attachments: #1 Requests for Judicial Notice by Scott R. James re Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)(Herr, Leonard)
September 26, 2013 Filing 13 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Kimberly Granger in re #12 Motion to Dismiss. (Woodbridge Guess, Catherine)
September 26, 2013 Filing 12 MOTION to DISMISS by Kimberly Granger. Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2013 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Woodbridge Guess, Catherine)
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Vacating September 30, 2013 Hearing And Order On Defendant's Motion To Dismiss (Doc. No. #7 ), signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/24/2013. (Fahrney, E)
September 20, 2013 Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kimberly Granger by Scott R. James.(Herr, Leonard)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION and ORDER for Leave for Plaintiff to File a First Amended Complaint. Pursuant to the above stipulation, Plaintiff shall file a First Amended Complaint on or before September 20, 2013. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/16/2013. (Timken, A)
September 12, 2013 Filing 8 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Amendment to Complaint by Scott R. James. (Herr, Leonard)
August 30, 2013 Filing 7 MOTION to DISMISS by Kimberly Granger. Attorney Woodbridge Guess, Catherine A. added. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2014 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Woodbridge Guess, Catherine)
July 30, 2013 Filing 6 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Kimberly Granger Waiver sent on 7/1/2013, answer due 8/30/2013. (Herr, Leonard)
June 27, 2013 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Gonzalez, R)
June 27, 2013 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Kimberly Granger* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Leonard Charles Herr* *Dooley, Herr, Pedersen & Berglund, Bailey, Attorney's at Law* *100 Willow Plaza, Suite 300* *Visalia, CA 93291-1351*. (Gonzalez, R)
June 27, 2013 RECEIPT number #CAE100022843 $400.00 fbo Scott R. James by Scott R. James on 6/27/2013. (Flores, E)
June 26, 2013 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Scott R. James (Herr, Leonard)
June 26, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violation of Civil Rights (42 U.S.C. Section 1983) against Kimberly Granger by Scott R. James.(Herr, Leonard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. Granger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott R. James
Represented By: Leonard Charles Herr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Granger
Represented By: Catherine A. Woodbridge Guess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Lindley
Represented By: Catherine A. Woodbridge Guess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?