Jackson v. Palombo et al
Plaintiff: Richard Jackson
Defendant: Mike Palombo and R. Nino
Case Number: 1:2013cv00986
Filed: June 27, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER SUMMARILY DENYING Plaintiff's Fourth and Fifth 27 28 Motions for Reconsideration signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/8/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Third 25 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 08/09/2016. (Flores, E)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 23 Motion for Reconsideration signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/26/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 21 Motion for Reconsideration signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 07/31/2014. (Flores, E)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of 14 Action for Failure to Obey a Court Order 13 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/19/2014, referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Deadline Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Palombo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Palombo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Nino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?