United States v. Approximately $17,285.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States
Defendant: Approximately $17,285.00 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 1:2013cv01074
Filed: July 12, 2013
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 SECOND STIPULATION and ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/14/2015. CASE CLOSED.(Lundstrom, T)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION to Continue Non-Expert Discovery Deadline; ORDER re 43 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/7/2015. Non-Expert discovery deadline continued from 2/4/2015 to 3/13/2015.(Martinez, A)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION to WITHDRAW 37 Request for Voluntary Dismissal; ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/19/2014. (Martinez, A)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for a continuance of the following pretrial deadlines: Expert and Supplemental Expert Disclosure Deadline set for 12/5/2014; Non-Expert Discovery due by 2/4/2015; Expert Discovery due by 3/13/2015; and the Non-Dispositive Motion filing deadline set for 4/10/2015. All other dates remain as previously set. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/22/2014. (Rooney, M)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue FRCP Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order Discovery Dates, Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/31/2014. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, the following discovery deadlines are extended: Non-Expert Discov ery Cut-Off, from 8/11/2014 to 10/7/2014; Expert Disclosure, from 9/8/2014 to 11/5/2014; Supplemental Expert Disclosure, from 10/8/2014 to 12/6/2014; Expert Discovery Cut-Off, from 12/8/2014 to 2/6/2015; Non-Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline, from 1/12/2015 to 3/10/2015. (Arellano, S.)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REQUEST and STIPULATION Continuing Presently Set Mandatory Scheduling Conference; ORDER Thereon signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/2/2014. Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 1/8/2014 is CONTINUED to 1/29/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin.(Martinez, A)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Time for Potential Claimant Debra Ann Periera to File a Claim, and Continuing Initial Scheduling Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/25/2013. Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 12/5/2013 is CONTINUED to 1/8/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin.(Martinez, A)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Regarding Clerk's Issuance of Warrant for Arrest of Articles in Rem, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/30/13. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States v. Approximately $17,285.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $17,285.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Heather Mardel Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?