Holcomb v. Ramar et al
Plaintiff: Harvey Holcomb
Defendant: Jerry Ramar, Officer Kroutil, Officer Cox, Officer Bottoms, Officer Ciccarelli, J. Chandler, City of Modesto and Richard Roe
Case Number: 1:2013cv01102
Filed: July 17, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 196 STIPULATION and ORDER REGARDING COSTS AND APPEAL, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/21/2017. (Kusamura, W)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER ON OBJECTIONS TO DR. BRAATON'S DE BENE ESSE DEPOSITOIN, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/10/2017. (Kusamura, W)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER Setting New Trial: Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing set for 7/25/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, Jury Trial set for 8/8/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/7/2017. (Kusamura, W)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER ON STIPULATION AND ORDER VACATING NOVEMBER 21, 2016 HEARING and re-setting to 12/12/2016 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/14/2016. (Kusamura, W) Modified on 11/14/2016 (Kusamura, W).
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER SETTING OCTOBER 18, 2016 TRIAL DATE, SETTING OCTOBER 11, 2016 TRIAL CONFIRMATION, AND ORDER MODIFYING NOVEMBER 20, 2015 PRE-TRIAL ORDER. (Trial Confirmation Hearing set for 10/11/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Jury Trial set for 10/18/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii), signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/11/2016. (Kusamura, W)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING, in part, and DENYING, in part, Defendants' motion for summary Judgment, document 51 , as follows: Plaintiff's 42 U.S.C. § 12132 claims are DISMISSED; Defendants' motion for summary judgment with respect to Plaintiff's 42 U.S.C. § 1983 false arrest claims against Officers Kroutil and Bottoms is GRANTED; and Defendants' motion for summary judgment is otherwise DENIED. Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/20/2015. (Rooney, M)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER DISMISSING Defendants Officer Ciccarelli, the City of Modesto and Plaintiff's Second Claim for Relief signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/7/2015. (Jessen, A)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER on 52 53 Stipulations, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/28/2015. (IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that; 1. The parties stipulation to bifurcate discovery and trial of Plaintiffs Monell claim (Doc. No. 52) is DENIED; 2. The parties stipu lation to extend expert discovery deadlines (Doc. No. 53) is GRANTED; and 3. The expert discovery deadlines are modified as follows: a. Deadline for Designation of Experts with Reports is October 30, 2015; b. Deadline for Designation of Rebuttal Experts with Reports is November 13, 2015; and c. Expert Discovery Cuttoff is December 11, 2015.)(Gaumnitz, R)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER EXTENDING Discovery Deadlines. The discovery schedule is modified as follows: Designation of Expert Reports due by 9/4/2015. Designation of Rebuttal Experts with Reports due by 9/18/2015. Expert Discovery Cutoff 10/2/2015. Non-Dispositive Motion filing deadline 8/24/2015. Non-Dispositive Motion Hearing deadline 9/23/2015. All other dates remain as set. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/10/2015. (Timken, A)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION and ORDER for DISMISSAL of Defendants Officer Cox and J. Chandler signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/5/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION and ORDER EXTENDING Discovery Cut-Off. Non-Expert Discovery Deadline: 8/15/2015. Expert Disclosures: 8/15/2015. Rebuttal-Supplemental Expert Disclosures: 8/28/2015. Expert Discovery Deadline: 9/11/2015. Non-Disposi tive Motions shall be filed by 8/12/2015. Non-Dispositive Motion Hearing Deadline: 9/9/2015. Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 8/17/2015. Dispositive Motion Hearing Deadline: 9/21/2015. The Pretrial Conference date of 11/4/2015, and the Trial date of 1/12/2016, remain unchanged. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/30/2015. (Timken, A)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION and ORDER for CONTINUANCE OF DISCOVERY CUT-OFF AND EXPERT DISCLOSURE. The scheduled is modified as follows: Non-Expert Discovery deadline reset to 7/1/2015; Expert Disclosure deadline reset to 7/13/2015; Rebuttal Expert Disclosure deadline reset to 7/24/2015. No other scheduling deadlines are modified. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/14/2015. (Timken, A)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER on Amended Stipulation for Protection Order. The Court adopts the Stipulation of the parties as an Order of the Court. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/3/2015. (Timken, A)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION and ORDER Amending Scheduling Order, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/2/2015. (The Scheduling Order shall be amended as follows; Fact discovery cutoff date is 6/12/2015; Disclosure of expert witnesses is 6/26/2015; Disclosur e of supplemental expert witnesses is 7/10/2015; Expert discovery cutoff date is 8/7/2015; Last day for non-dispositive motions to be filed is 7/31/2015; Last day for dispositive motions to be heard is 9/7/2015; Pretrial Conference set for 11/4/2015, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Jury Trial set for 1/26/2016, at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii.) (Gaumnitz, R)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DENYING Without Prejudice Stipulated Protective Order 32 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/25/2015. (Timken, A)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION and ORDER Amending Scheduling Order, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/21/2014. (The Scheduling Order shall be amended as follows; Fact discovery cutoff date is 3/13/2015; Disclosure of expert witnesses is 3/27/2015; Disclo sure of supplemental expert witnesses is 4/10/2015; Expert discovery cutoff date is 4/24/2015; Last day for non-dispositive motions to be filed is 5/1/2015; Last day for dispositive motions to be heard is 6/8/2015; Pretrial Conference set for 7/29/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Jury Trial set for 9/22/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii.)(Gaumnitz, R)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER VACATING Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/29/2014. (Hernandez, M)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER on 9 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/1/2013. (Amended Complaint due by 11/18/2013).(Lundstrom, T)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER vacating hearing of September 30, 2013 and taking matter under submission signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/26/13. (Nazaroff, H)
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/19/2013. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holcomb v. Ramar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey Holcomb
Represented By: Anthony Martin Boskovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Ramar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Kroutil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Bottoms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Ciccarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Modesto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?