Curtis v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Albert George Curtis
Defendant: HD Development of Maryland, Inc and Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv01151
Filed: July 24, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION For DISMISSAL Of Action; ORDER, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/5/2015. CASE CLOSED.(Fahrney, E)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER on Cross 43 46 Motions for Summary Judgment, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/23/2015. (Gaumnitz, R)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER on Plaintiff's 47 Ex Parte Application, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/9/2014. (IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiffs ex parte application to strike (Doc. No. 47) is WITHDRAWN and DENIED as moot; 2. The parties may file oppositions to the cross-summary judgment motions on or before December 22, 2014; and 3. The parties may file replies to the oppositions on or before January 6, 2015.)(Gaumnitz, R)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER For Response to Plaintiff's 47 Ex Parte Application and ORDER Vacating December 1, 2014 Hearing Date, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/12/2014. (IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Defendant is to respond to Plaintiffs ex pa rte application to strike, as well as the possible Rule 37 (c)(1) remedy discussed above, as soon as possible but no later 11/24/2014; 2. Plaintiff may file a reply to Defendants response as soon as possible, but no later than 12/5/2014; and 3. The 12/1/2014, hearing on the parties respective 43 46 summary judgment motions is VACATED.) (Gaumnitz, R)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Plaintiff's 42 Request to File Documents Under Seal; ORDER signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/26/2014. (IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the five pages of documents identified as HD000004, HD000006, HD000008, HD000010 and HD000012, are tobe filed under seal as Exhibit C to the Declaration of Tanya E. Moore in Support of Plaintiffs 43 Motion for Summary Judgment, or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication.)(Gaumnitz, R)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Stipulation for PROTECTIVE ORDER and ORDER Thereon signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/24/2014. (Martinez, A)
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 18 Motion to Amend Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/11/2014. (Martinez, A)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting 29 Request for Leave to Appear Telephonically signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/24/2014. (Martinez, A)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting 21 Request for Leave to Appear Telephonically signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/6/2014. (Martinez, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtis v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert George Curtis
Represented By: Tanya E. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HD Development of Maryland, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Francis Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?