Hammond v. Management & Training Corporation (MTC) et al
Plaintiff: Demond Hammond
Defendant: Management & Training Corporation (MTC) and JOHN DOES 1-9
Case Number: 1:2013cv01209
Filed: August 2, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER Directing the Clerk to Close the Action Based Upon the Parties' Stipulation to Dismiss this Action With Prejudice 155 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/1/17. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER AFTER 152 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/30/2017. All pending dates, conferences and hearings are VACATED. Stipulated dismissal due by 10/30/2017. (Hall, S)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES FOR TRIAL, Jury Trial currently set for 9/12/2017 is moved to 9/19/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/7/2017. (Kusamura, W)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment re Premises Liability (Doc Nos. 86 87 ) signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/27/2017. It is hereby ordered that (1) Defendant's motion for summary judgment on Plaintiffs' in dividual claims for premises liability is DENIED as to all Plaintiffs. (2) The Clerk of the Court shall file this decision in each separate case: Aluya v. Management & Training Corp. 13cv1345; Hammond v. Management & Training Corp. 13cv1209; and Sutton v. Management & Training Corp 13cv1344. (Valdez, E)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 FURTHER SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/10/2017. Briefing related to MTC's duties: Filing Deadline 2/24/2017; Reply deadline 3/17/2017. Expert Discovery Deadline 3/13/2017. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadli nes: Filed by 3/27/2017; Hearing by 4/24/2017. Pretrial Conference set for 6/28/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Jury Trial set for 9/12/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Hall, S)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING 57 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/10/2015. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Granting Stipulated Leave to File Sur-Reply, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/17/2015. (The court hereby GRANTS 66 Plaintiff's request for leave to file a sur-reply. Such sur-reply shall be filed and served not later than seven (7) days from the date of service of this order.)(Gaumnitz, R)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER DENYING 55 Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/27/2015. (Hall, S)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DENYING 51 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Discovery Requests, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/29/2015. (Hall, S)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING IN PART 44 Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/5/2014. (Hall, S)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 44 Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/26/2014. Discovery Deadlines: Deposition of Dr. Rucker to be completed by 12/31/2014; Expert Discovery to be completed by 3/27/2015. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 3/30/2015; Hearing by 5/27/2015. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 5/4/2015; Hearing by 6/22/2015. (Hall, S)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING 41 Plaintiff's Request for Telephonic Appearance, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/17/2014. (Hall, S)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING 36 Joint Stipulation to Conduct the Deposition of Plaintiff at His Place of Incarceration in Person or via Video Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/5/2014. (Hall, S)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DENYING Request for Plaintiff's Personal Appearance at the Settlement Conference (Doc. 31 ), Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/27/2014. (Arellano, S.)
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING 27 Stipulation to Continue Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/6/2014. Settlement Conference CONTINUED to 8/26/2014 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Request for Telephonic Appearance re 23 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/24/2014. (Hall, S)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING Defendant's Motion to Stay Without Prejudice 12 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/13/2013. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hammond v. Management & Training Corporation (MTC) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Management & Training Corporation (MTC)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demond Hammond
Represented By: Ian Michael Wallach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?