Mendoza v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Maria Mendoza
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2013cv01213
Filed: August 5, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING 20 Plaintiff's Stipulated Motion for Attorney Fees, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/13/2015. (Timken, A)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER on Plaintiff's Complaint 15 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/23/15: The Clerk of this Court is DIRECTED to enter judgment in favor of Plaintiff Maria Mendoza, and against Defendant Carolyn W. Colvin, Acting Commissioner of Social Security. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING Request that Plaintiff be permitted additional time to serve a confidential letter brief on Defendant. Plaintiff's confidential letter brief shall be served on Defendant no later than February 28, 2014; Pl aintiff shall file a proof of service of the confidential letter brief; and the remainder of the deadlines shall be calculated pursuant to the requirements of the Scheduling Order. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/10/2014. (Timken, A)
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 3 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 08/05/2013. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendoza v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Mendoza
Represented By: Kelsey Mackenzie Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Timothy Bolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?