San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority et al v. Jewell et al
Plaintiff: San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority and Westlands Water District
Defendant: Sally Jewell, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, Michael L. Connor, David Murrillo and Hoopa Valley Tribe
Intervenor_defendant: Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Institute for Fisheries Resources and Yurok Tribe
Case Number: 1:2013cv01232
Filed: August 7, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42:4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER to disburse funds signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/6/2021.(Lundstrom, T)
October 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 183 FINAL JUDGMENT dated *10/24/2014* signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/24/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER RE CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Docs. 112 & 120) signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on October 1, 2014. (Munoz, I)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER DENYING AUGUST 25, 2014 REQUEST FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER/PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION 142 143 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on August 27, 2014. (Munoz, I)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 137 REQUEST FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on August 12, 2014. (Munoz, I)
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER Granting 94 Stay of Proceedings signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/8/2013. (Martinez, A)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER LIFTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND DENYING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 08/22/13. (Coffman, Lisa)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STIPULATION and ORDER RE: WITNESSES, EXHIBITS AND ORAL ARGUMENT FOR SHOW CAUSE HEARING signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on August 19, 2013. (Munoz, I)
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATION and ORDER CLARIFYING NON-EFFECT ON BOAT DANCE FLOW RELEASES signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on August 16, 2013. (Munoz, I)
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION and ORDER Granting Yurok Tribe's 61 Motion to Intervene signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/15/2013. The hearing before Judge O'Neill currently scheduled for October 11, 2013, at 9:30 a.m. is vacated. (Martinez, A)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MODIFIED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER EXTENDING INJUNCTION THROUGH AUGUST 23, 2013 AND SETTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING ON AUGUST 21, 2013 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on August 14, 2013. (Munoz, I)
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on August 13, 2013. (Munoz, I)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION and ORDER re 9 , 13 Motions to Intervene signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/12/2013. The hearings before Judge O'Neill and Judge Austin currently scheduled for October 4, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. are both VACATED.(Martinez, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority et al v. Jewell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority
Represented By: Rebecca Rose Akroyd
Represented By: Michelle C. Kales, PHV
Represented By: Daniel Joseph O'Hanlon
Represented By: Eric Nelson Robinson
Represented By: Steven O. Sims, PHV
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Williamson, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westlands Water District
Represented By: Rebecca Rose Akroyd
Represented By: Michelle C. Kales, PHV
Represented By: Daniel Joseph O'Hanlon
Represented By: Eric Nelson Robinson
Represented By: Steven O. Sims, PHV
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Williamson, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally Jewell
Represented By: Sara Christi Porsia, GOVT
Represented By: Anna K. Stimmel, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of the Interior
Represented By: Sara Christi Porsia, GOVT
Represented By: Anna K. Stimmel, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bureau of Reclamation
Represented By: Sara Christi Porsia, GOVT
Represented By: Anna K. Stimmel, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael L. Connor
Represented By: Sara Christi Porsia, GOVT
Represented By: Anna K. Stimmel, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Murrillo
Represented By: Sara Christi Porsia, GOVT
Represented By: Anna K. Stimmel, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoopa Valley Tribe
Represented By: Patricia A. Prochaska
Represented By: Thomas P. Schlosser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations
Represented By: Jan Hasselman, PHV
Represented By: Trent William Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Institute for Fisheries Resources
Represented By: Jan Hasselman, PHV
Represented By: Trent William Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Yurok Tribe
Represented By: John William Corbett
Represented By: Nathan Markus Voegeli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?