Schultz v. Stericycle, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Veronica Schultz
Defendant: Mike Storie, Stericycle, Inc. and DOES 1 through 50
Case Number: 1:2013cv01244
Filed: August 9, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DISMISSING CASE Pursuant to Stipulation signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 7/8/2014. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Stipulation to Dismiss Defendant Mike Storie with Prejudice and to File an Amended Complaint; ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/4/13. Mike Storie terminated. (Verduzco, M)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on September 30, 2013. (Munoz, I)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ON DEFENDANT STORIE'S F.R.Civ.P.12(c) Motion 7 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on September 4, 2013. (Munoz, I)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schultz v. Stericycle, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Storie
Represented By: Steven L. Hamann, PHV
Represented By: Lucky U. Meinz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stericycle, Inc.
Represented By: Lucky U. Meinz
Represented By: Steven L. Hamann, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Schultz
Represented By: Mark J Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?