Heyer v. Krueger et al
Plaintiff: Richard D. Heyer
Defendant: Brian McNutt and Angela Krueger
Case Number: 1:2013cv01297
Filed: August 14, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DISMISSING Complaint WITHOUT Leave to Amend, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/21/15: This terminates this action in its entirety. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration 28 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/5/14: Motion is DENIED with prejudice. (Hellings, J)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DISREGARDING Plaintiff's 24 Motion for Clarification signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/17/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Produce Documents 22 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/4/13. (Hellings, J)
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's 18 Motion for Clarification, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/5/2013. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 15 Motion to Amend as Moot; ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 16 Motion for Court Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/17/2013. (Flores, E)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel 9 ; ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification 10 ; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery 12 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/12/13. (Hellings, J)
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/15/2013, CASE TRANSFERRRED to Fresno Division. New Case Number 1:13-cv-1297 DLB (PC). Old Case Number 2:13-cv-1677 EFB (PC). All future filings shall bear the new Fresno case number. (Waggoner, D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heyer v. Krueger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian McNutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Krueger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard D. Heyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?